House
|
05/02/2023
|
Received notice of Final Reading (Sen. Com. No. 993).
|
|
|
House
|
05/02/2023
|
Recommitted to Conference committee as amended in CD 1 with none voting no and none excused.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/02/2023
|
Passed Final Reading, as amended (CD 1). Ayes, 25; Aye(s) with reservations: none. Noes, 0 (none). Excused, 0 (none).
|
|
|
House
|
04/27/2023
|
Forty-eight (48) hours notice Tuesday, 05-02-23.
|
|
|
House
|
04/27/2023
|
Reported from Conference Committee (Conf Com. Rep. No. 61) as amended in (CD 1).
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/27/2023
|
48 Hrs. Notice (as amended CD 1) 05-02-23.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/27/2023
|
Reported from Conference Committee as amended CD 1 (Conf. Com. Rep. No. 61).
|
|
|
House
|
04/27/2023
|
The Conference Committee recommends that the measure be Passed, with Amendments. The votes were as follows: 5 Ayes: Representative(s) Gates, Tarnas, Chun, Kahaloa, Ward; Ayes with reservations: none; 0 Noes: none; and 0 Excused: none.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/27/2023
|
The Conference committee recommends that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes of the Senate Conference Managers were as follows: 4 Aye(s): Senator(s) Gabbard, Wakai, Rhoads, Richards; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 0 Excused: none.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/26/2023
|
Conference committee meeting to reconvene on 04-27-23 11:00AM; Conference Room 325.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/25/2023
|
Conference committee meeting to reconvene on 04-26-23 9:00AM; Conference Room 325.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/24/2023
|
Conference committee meeting to reconvene on 04-25-23 9:22AM; Conference Room 325.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/24/2023
|
Received notice of appointment of House conferees (Hse. Com. No. 838).
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/21/2023
|
Conference committee meeting scheduled for 04-24-23 11:10AM; Conference Room 325.
|
|
|
House
|
04/21/2023
|
House Conferees Appointed: Gates, Tarnas Co-Chairs; Chun, Kahaloa, Ward.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/18/2023
|
Senate Conferees Appointed: Gabbard Chair; Wakai, Rhoads Co-Chairs; Richards.
|
|
|
House
|
04/18/2023
|
Received notice of Senate conferees (Sen. Com. No. 901).
|
|
|
House
|
04/11/2023
|
Received notice of disagreement (Sen. Com. No. 882).
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/11/2023
|
Senate disagrees with House amendments.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/11/2023
|
Received from House (Hse. Com. No. 688).
|
|
|
House
|
04/06/2023
|
Passed Third Reading as amended in HD 2 with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Nishimoto excused (1). Transmitted to Senate.
|
|
|
House
|
04/05/2023
|
Deferred one day 04-06-23.
|
|
|
House
|
04/03/2023
|
Forty-eight (48) hours notice Wednesday, 04-05-23.
|
|
|
House
|
04/03/2023
|
Reported from JHA (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 1880) as amended in HD 2, recommending passage on Third Reading.
|
|
|
House
|
03/29/2023
|
The committee on JHA recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 8 Ayes: Representative(s) Tarnas, Takayama, Ganaden, Hashimoto, Ichiyama, Kong, Mizuno, Souza; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and 2 Excused: Representative(s) Holt, Ilagan.
|
|
|
House
|
03/24/2023
|
Bill scheduled to be heard by JHA on Wednesday, 03-29-23 2:00PM in House conference room 325 VIA VIDEOCONFERENCE.
|
|
|
House
|
03/22/2023
|
Passed Second Reading as amended in HD 1 and referred to the committee(s) on JHA with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Kitagawa excused (1).
|
|
|
House
|
03/22/2023
|
Reported from AGR (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 1416) as amended in HD 1, recommending passage on Second Reading and referral to JHA.
|
|
|
House
|
03/17/2023
|
The committee on AGR recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 6 Ayes: Representative(s) Gates, Kahaloa, Cochran, Lowen, Perruso, Ward; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and 1 Excused: Representative(s) Woodson.
|
|
|
House
|
03/15/2023
|
Bill scheduled to be heard by AGR on Friday, 03-17-23 9:30AM in House conference room 325 VIA VIDEOCONFERENCE.
|
|
|
House
|
03/09/2023
|
Referred to AGR, JHA, referral sheet 17
|
|
|
House
|
03/09/2023
|
Pass First Reading
|
|
|
House
|
03/07/2023
|
Received from Senate (Sen. Com. No. 219) in amended form (SD 1).
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/07/2023
|
Report adopted; Passed Third Reading. Ayes, 24; Aye(s) with reservations: none . Noes, 0 (none). Excused, 1 (Senator(s) Fukunaga). Transmitted to House.
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/03/2023
|
One Day Notice 03-07-23.
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/03/2023
|
Reported from JDC (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 727) with recommendation of passage on Third Reading.
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/24/2023
|
The committee(s) on JDC recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes in JDC were as follows: 5 Aye(s): Senator(s) Rhoads, Gabbard, Elefante, San Buenaventura, Awa; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 0 Excused: none.
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/21/2023
|
The committee(s) on JDC will hold a public decision making on 02-24-23 9:30AM; Conference Room 016 & Videoconference.
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/16/2023
|
Report adopted; Passed Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referred to JDC.
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/16/2023
|
Reported from AEN/PSM (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 388) with recommendation of passage on Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referral to JDC.
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/13/2023
|
The committee(s) on AEN recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in AEN were as follows: 5 Aye(s): Senator(s) Gabbard, Richards, DeCoite, Rhoads, Awa; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 0 Excused: none.
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/13/2023
|
The committee(s) on PSM recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in PSM were as follows: 5 Aye(s): Senator(s) Wakai, Elefante, Fukunaga, McKelvey, Awa; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 0 Excused: none.
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/10/2023
|
The committee(s) on AEN/PSM has scheduled a public hearing on 02-13-23 1:30PM; Conference Room 224 & Videoconference.
|
|
|
Senate
|
01/25/2023
|
Referred to AEN/PSM, JDC.
|
|
|
Senate
|
01/23/2023
|
Passed First Reading.
|
|
|
Senate
|
01/20/2023
|
Introduced.
|
|
|