Senate
|
04/28/2023
|
Conference committee meeting to reconvene on 04-28-23 4:30PM; Conference Room 309.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/27/2023
|
Conference committee meeting to reconvene on 04-28-23 1:59PM; Conference Room 224.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/26/2023
|
Conference committee meeting scheduled for 04-27-23 1:50PM; Conference Room 224.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/25/2023
|
Conference committee meeting to reconvene on 04-26-23 1:50PM; Conference Room 224.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/24/2023
|
Conference committee meeting scheduled for 04-25-23 1:50PM; Conference Room 224.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/24/2023
|
Received notice of appointment of House conferees (Hse. Com. No. 840).
|
|
|
House
|
04/21/2023
|
House Conferees Appointed: Holt, Sayama, Yamashita Co-Chairs; Kong, Lamosao, Pierick.
|
|
|
House
|
04/20/2023
|
Received notice of Senate conferees (Sen. Com. No. 915).
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/20/2023
|
Senate Conferees Appointed: Keohokalole Chair; Wakai Co-Chair; Awa.
|
|
|
House
|
04/11/2023
|
Received notice of disagreement (Sen. Com. No. 882).
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/11/2023
|
Senate disagrees with House amendments.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/11/2023
|
Received from House (Hse. Com. No. 689).
|
|
|
House
|
04/06/2023
|
Passed Third Reading with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Nishimoto excused (1). Transmitted to Senate.
|
|
|
House
|
04/06/2023
|
Reported from FIN (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 2076), recommending passage on Third Reading.
|
|
|
House
|
03/30/2023
|
The committee on FIN recommend that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes were as follows: 16 Ayes: Representative(s) Yamashita, Kitagawa, Aiu, Chun, Cochran, Garrett, Kahaloa, Kila, Kobayashi, Lamosao, Morikawa, Nishimoto, Poepoe, Takenouchi, Alcos, Ward; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and Excused: none.
|
|
|
House
|
03/28/2023
|
Bill scheduled to be heard by FIN on Thursday, 03-30-23 3:00PM in House conference room 308 VIA VIDEOCONFERENCE.
|
|
|
House
|
03/24/2023
|
Report adopted; referred to the committee(s) on FIN with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Ilagan excused (1).
|
|
|
House
|
03/24/2023
|
Reported from CPC (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 1565), recommending referral to FIN.
|
|
|
House
|
03/23/2023
|
The committee on CPC recommend that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes were as follows: 9 Ayes: Representative(s) Nakashima, Sayama, Amato, Belatti, Hussey-Burdick, Gates, Onishi, Tam, Pierick; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and 2 Excused: Representative(s) Hashem, Lowen.
|
|
|
House
|
03/21/2023
|
Bill scheduled to be heard by CPC on Thursday, 03-23-23 3:00PM in House conference room 329 VIA VIDEOCONFERENCE.
|
|
|
House
|
03/17/2023
|
Passed Second Reading as amended in HD 1 and referred to the committee(s) on CPC with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Cochran excused (1).
|
|
|
House
|
03/17/2023
|
Reported from ECD (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 1282) as amended in HD 1, recommending passage on Second Reading and referral to CPC.
|
|
|
House
|
03/15/2023
|
The committee on ECD recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 6 Ayes: Representative(s) Holt, Lamosao, La Chica, Nakamura, Quinlan, Pierick; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and 2 Excused: Representative(s) Hussey-Burdick, Kong.
|
|
|
House
|
03/13/2023
|
Bill scheduled to be heard by ECD on Wednesday, 03-15-23 10:00AM in House conference room 423 VIA VIDEOCONFERENCE.
|
|
|
House
|
03/09/2023
|
Referred to ECD, CPC, FIN, referral sheet 17
|
|
|
House
|
03/09/2023
|
Pass First Reading
|
|
|
House
|
03/07/2023
|
Received from Senate (Sen. Com. No. 221) in amended form (SD 2).
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/07/2023
|
Report Adopted; Passed Third Reading, as amended (SD 2). Ayes, 24; Aye(s) with reservations: none. Noes, 0 (none). Excused, 1 (Senator(s) Fukunaga). Transmitted to House.
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/03/2023
|
48 Hrs. Notice 03-07-23.
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/03/2023
|
Reported from WAM (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 939) with recommendation of passage on Third Reading, as amended (SD 2).
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/28/2023
|
The committee(s) on WAM recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in WAM were as follows: 13 Aye(s): Senator(s) Dela Cruz, Keith-Agaran, Aquino, DeCoite, Inouye, Kanuha, Kidani, Kim, Lee, Moriwaki, Shimabukuro, Wakai, Fevella; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 0 Excused: none.
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/23/2023
|
The committee(s) on WAM will hold a public decision making on 02-28-23 10:00AM; Conference Room 211 & Videoconference.
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/17/2023
|
Report adopted; Passed Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referred to WAM.
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/17/2023
|
Reported from CPN (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 599) with recommendation of passage on Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referral to WAM.
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/03/2023
|
The committee(s) on CPN recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in CPN were as follows: 5 Aye(s): Senator(s) Keohokalole, Fukunaga, McKelvey, Richards, Awa; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 0 Excused: none.
|
|
|
Senate
|
01/30/2023
|
The committee(s) on CPN has scheduled a public hearing on 02-03-23 9:30AM; Conference Room 229 & Videoconference.
|
|
|
Senate
|
01/25/2023
|
Referred to CPN, WAM.
|
|
|
Senate
|
01/23/2023
|
Passed First Reading.
|
|
|
Senate
|
01/20/2023
|
Introduced.
|
|
|