Senate | 02/06/2023 | Report adopted; Passed Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referred to WAM/JDC. | ||
Senate | 02/06/2023 | Reported from PSM (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 38) with recommendation of passage on Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referral to WAM/JDC. | ||
Senate | 02/01/2023 | The committee(s) on PSM recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in PSM were as follows: 4 Aye(s): Senator(s) Wakai, Fukunaga, McKelvey; Aye(s) with reservations: Senator(s) Elefante ; 1 No(es): Senator(s) Awa; and 0 Excused: none. | ||
Senate | 01/27/2023 | The committee(s) on PSM has scheduled a public hearing on 02-01-23 3:00PM; Conference Room 225 & Videoconference. | ||
Senate | 01/25/2023 | Referred to PSM, WAM/JDC. | ||
Senate | 01/23/2023 | Passed First Reading. | ||
Senate | 01/20/2023 | Introduced. |