Senate
|
02/08/2023
|
Report adopted; Passed Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referred to JDC/WAM, with Senator Elefante voting "Aye, with reservations".
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/08/2023
|
Reported from WTL/AEN (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 94) with recommendation of passage on Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referral to JDC/WAM.
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/03/2023
|
The committee(s) on AEN recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in AEN were as follows: 4 Aye(s): Senator(s) Gabbard, Richards; Aye(s) with reservations: Senator(s) DeCoite, Rhoads ; 1 No(es): Senator(s) Awa; and 0 Excused: none.
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/03/2023
|
The committee(s) on WTL recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in WTL were as follows: 4 Aye(s): Senator(s) Inouye, Chang; Aye(s) with reservations: Senator(s) Elefante, McKelvey ; 1 No(es): Senator(s) Fevella; and 0 Excused: none.
|
|
|
Senate
|
01/30/2023
|
The committee(s) on WTL/AEN deferred the measure until 02-03-23 2:05PM; Conference Room 224 & Videoconference.
|
|
|
Senate
|
01/27/2023
|
The committee(s) on WTL/AEN has scheduled a public hearing on 01-30-23 1:00PM; Conference Room 224 & Videoconference.
|
|
|
Senate
|
01/27/2023
|
Re-Referred to WTL/AEN, JDC/WAM.
|
|
|
Senate
|
01/20/2023
|
Referred to WTL/AEN, JDC.
|
|
|
Senate
|
01/18/2023
|
Introduced and passed First Reading.
|
|
|
Senate
|
01/14/2023
|
Pending Introduction.
|
|
|