House
|
04/24/2023
|
Received notice of Senate conferees (Sen. Com. No. 976).
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/24/2023
|
Senate Conferees Appointed: Moriwaki Chair; Kim Co-Chair; Fevella.
|
|
|
House
|
04/13/2023
|
Received notice of disagreement (Sen. Com. No. 888).
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/13/2023
|
Senate disagrees with House amendments.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/13/2023
|
Received from House (Hse. Com. No. 747).
|
|
|
House
|
04/11/2023
|
Passed Third Reading as amended in HD 2 with Representative(s) Hussey-Burdick, Souza voting aye with reservations; Representative(s) Aiu, Alcos, Amato, Chun, Evslin, Garcia, Garrett, Gates, Holt, Kahaloa, Kapela, Kila, La Chica, Lamosao, Martinez, Poepoe, Takenouchi voting no (17) and Representative(s) Todd excused (1). Transmitted to Senate.
|
|
|
House
|
04/06/2023
|
Forty-eight (48) hours notice Tuesday, 04-11-23.
|
|
|
House
|
04/06/2023
|
Reported from FIN (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 2143) as amended in HD 2, recommending passage on Third Reading.
|
|
|
House
|
04/05/2023
|
The committee on FIN recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 15 Ayes: Representative(s) Yamashita, Kitagawa, Cochran, Kobayashi, Morikawa, Ward; Ayes with reservations: Representative(s) Aiu, Chun, Garrett, Kahaloa, Kila, Lamosao, Poepoe, Takenouchi, Alcos; Noes: none; and 1 Excused: Representative(s) Nishimoto.
|
|
|
House
|
04/03/2023
|
Bill scheduled to be heard by FIN on Wednesday, 04-05-23 2:00PM in House conference room 308 VIA VIDEOCONFERENCE.
|
|
|
House
|
03/24/2023
|
Passed Second Reading as amended in HD 1 and referred to the committee(s) on FIN with Representative(s) Garrett, Hussey-Burdick voting aye with reservations; Representative(s) Kapela voting no (1) and Representative(s) Ilagan excused (1).
|
|
|
House
|
03/24/2023
|
Reported from LGO (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 1557) as amended in HD 1, recommending passage on Second Reading and referral to FIN.
|
|
|
House
|
03/23/2023
|
The committee on LGO recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 5 Ayes: Representative(s) Matayoshi, Kapela, Sayama, Alcos; Ayes with reservations: Representative(s) Garrett; Noes: none; and 2 Excused: Representative(s) Martinez, Tam.
|
|
|
House
|
03/20/2023
|
Bill scheduled for decision making on Thursday, 03-23-23 9:30AM in conference room 309 VIA VIDEOCONFERENCE.
|
|
|
House
|
03/14/2023
|
The committee(s) on LGO recommend(s) that the measure be deferred.
|
|
|
House
|
03/10/2023
|
Bill scheduled to be heard by LGO on Tuesday, 03-14-23 9:30AM in House conference room 309 VIA VIDEOCONFERENCE.
|
|
|
House
|
03/09/2023
|
Referred to LGO, FIN, referral sheet 17
|
|
|
House
|
03/09/2023
|
Pass First Reading
|
|
|
House
|
03/07/2023
|
Received from Senate (Sen. Com. No. 241) in amended form (SD 2).
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/07/2023
|
Report adopted; Passed Third Reading, as amended (SD 2). Ayes, 24; Aye(s) with reservations: none . Noes, 0 (none). Excused, 1 (Senator(s) Fukunaga). Transmitted to House.
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/03/2023
|
48 Hrs. Notice 03-07-23.
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/03/2023
|
Reported from WAM (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 1059) with recommendation of passage on Third Reading, as amended (SD 2).
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/02/2023
|
The committee(s) on WAM recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in WAM were as follows: 12 Aye(s): Senator(s) Dela Cruz, Keith-Agaran, Aquino, Inouye, Kanuha, Kidani, Kim, Lee, Moriwaki, Shimabukuro, Wakai, Fevella; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 1 Excused: Senator(s) DeCoite.
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/01/2023
|
The committee(s) on WAM deferred the measure until 03-02-23 10:05AM; Conference Room 211.
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/28/2023
|
The committee(s) on WAM deferred the measure until 03-01-23 9:40AM; CR 211.
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/23/2023
|
The committee(s) on WAM will hold a public decision making on 02-28-23 10:00AM; Conference Room 211 & Videoconference.
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/07/2023
|
Report adopted; Passed Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referred to WAM.
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/07/2023
|
Reported from LBT (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 49) with recommendation of passage on Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referral to WAM.
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/01/2023
|
The committee(s) on LBT recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in LBT were as follows: 4 Aye(s): Senator(s) Moriwaki, Lee, Ihara, Fevella; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 1 Excused: Senator(s) Keith-Agaran.
|
|
|
Senate
|
01/27/2023
|
The committee(s) on LBT has scheduled a public hearing on 02-01-23 3:00PM; Conference Room 224 & Videoconference.
|
|
|
Senate
|
01/25/2023
|
Referred to LBT, WAM.
|
|
|
Senate
|
01/23/2023
|
Passed First Reading.
|
|
|
Senate
|
01/20/2023
|
Introduced.
|
|
|