House
|
04/27/2023
|
Conference Committee Meeting will reconvene on Friday 04-28-23 9:45AM in conference room 229.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/26/2023
|
Conference committee meeting to reconvene on 04-27-23 9:45AM; Conference Room 229.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/25/2023
|
Conference committee meeting scheduled for 04-26-23 9:30AM; Conference Room 229.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/25/2023
|
Received notice of change in conferees (Hse. Com. No. 865).
|
|
|
House
|
04/24/2023
|
House Conferees Added: Representative Kitagawa added as Co-Chair.
|
|
|
House
|
04/24/2023
|
Re-referred to WAL, JHA, FIN, referral sheet 35
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/24/2023
|
Received notice of appointment of House conferees (Hse. Com. No. 838).
|
|
|
House
|
04/21/2023
|
House Conferees Appointed: Ichiyama, Tarnas Co-Chairs; Morikawa, Poepoe, Souza.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/18/2023
|
Senate Conferees Appointed: Inouye Chair; Shimabukuro, Gabbard Co-Chairs.
|
|
|
House
|
04/18/2023
|
Received notice of Senate conferees (Sen. Com. No. 901).
|
|
|
House
|
04/04/2023
|
Received notice of disagreement (Sen. Com. No. 557).
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/04/2023
|
Senate disagrees with House amendments.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/04/2023
|
Received from House (Hse. Com. No. 550).
|
|
|
House
|
04/03/2023
|
Passed Third Reading as amended in HD 2 with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Nishimoto excused (1). Transmitted to Senate.
|
|
|
House
|
03/31/2023
|
Forty-eight (48) hours notice Monday, 04-03-23.
|
|
|
House
|
03/31/2023
|
Reported from JHA (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 1865) as amended in HD 2, recommending passage on Third Reading.
|
|
|
House
|
03/29/2023
|
The committee on JHA recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 8 Ayes: Representative(s) Tarnas, Takayama, Ganaden, Hashimoto, Ichiyama, Kong, Mizuno, Souza; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and 2 Excused: Representative(s) Holt, Ilagan.
|
|
|
House
|
03/24/2023
|
Bill scheduled to be heard by JHA on Wednesday, 03-29-23 2:00PM in House conference room 325 VIA VIDEOCONFERENCE.
|
|
|
House
|
03/22/2023
|
Passed Second Reading as amended in HD 1 and referred to the committee(s) on JHA with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Kitagawa excused (1).
|
|
|
House
|
03/22/2023
|
Reported from WAL (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 1425) as amended in HD 1, recommending passage on Second Reading and referral to JHA.
|
|
|
House
|
03/16/2023
|
The committee on WAL recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 7 Ayes: Representative(s) Ichiyama, Poepoe, Chun, Ganaden, Morikawa, Takayama, Souza; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and 1 Excused: Representative(s) Hashem.
|
|
|
House
|
03/13/2023
|
Bill scheduled to be heard by WAL on Thursday, 03-16-23 10:00AM in House conference room 430 VIA VIDEOCONFERENCE.
|
|
|
House
|
03/09/2023
|
Referred to WAL, JHA, referral sheet 17
|
|
|
House
|
03/09/2023
|
Pass First Reading
|
|
|
House
|
03/07/2023
|
Received from Senate (Sen. Com. No. 246) in amended form (SD 1).
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/07/2023
|
Report adopted; Passed Third Reading. Ayes, 24; Aye(s) with reservations: none . Noes, 0 (none). Excused, 1 (Senator(s) Fukunaga). Transmitted to House.
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/03/2023
|
One Day Notice 03-07-23.
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/03/2023
|
Reported from JDC (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 1080) with recommendation of passage on Third Reading.
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/02/2023
|
The committee(s) on JDC recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes in JDC were as follows: 4 Aye(s): Senator(s) Rhoads, Gabbard, Elefante, San Buenaventura; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 1 Excused: Senator(s) Awa.
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/28/2023
|
The committee(s) on JDC will hold a public decision making on 03-02-23 9:50AM; Conference Room 016 & Videoconference.
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/13/2023
|
Report adopted; Passed Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referred to JDC.
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/13/2023
|
Reported from WTL/HWN (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 198) with recommendation of passage on Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referral to JDC.
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/08/2023
|
The committee(s) on HWN recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in HWN were as follows: 5 Aye(s): Senator(s) Shimabukuro, Fevella, Ihara, Keohokalole, Richards; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 0 Excused: none.
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/08/2023
|
The committee(s) on WTL recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in WTL were as follows: 4 Aye(s): Senator(s) Inouye, McKelvey, Fevella; Aye(s) with reservations: Senator(s) Elefante ; 0 No(es): none; and 1 Excused: Senator(s) Chang.
|
|
|
Senate
|
01/31/2023
|
The committee(s) on WTL/HWN deferred the measure until 02-08-23 1:00PM; Conference Room 229.
|
|
|
Senate
|
01/27/2023
|
The committee(s) on WTL/HWN has scheduled a public hearing on 01-31-23 1:00PM; Conference Room 224 & Videoconference.
|
|
|
Senate
|
01/25/2023
|
Referred to WTL/HWN, JDC.
|
|
|
Senate
|
01/23/2023
|
Passed First Reading.
|
|
|
Senate
|
01/20/2023
|
Introduced.
|
|
|