Senate | 02/13/2023 | Report adopted; Passed Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referred to WAM. | ||
Senate | 02/13/2023 | Reported from HRE (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 188) with recommendation of passage on Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referral to WAM. | ||
Senate | 02/07/2023 | The committee(s) on HRE recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in HRE were as follows: 5 Aye(s): Senator(s) Kim, Kidani, Fukunaga, Keith-Agaran, Fevella; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 0 Excused: none. | ||
Senate | 02/03/2023 | The committee(s) on HRE has scheduled a public hearing on 02-07-23 3:00PM; Conference Room 229 & Videoconference. | ||
Senate | 01/25/2023 | Referred to HRE, WAM. | ||
Senate | 01/23/2023 | Passed First Reading. | ||
Senate | 01/20/2023 | Introduced. |