House
|
03/15/2023
|
The committee(s) on ECD recommend(s) that the measure be deferred.
|
|
|
House
|
03/13/2023
|
Bill scheduled to be heard by ECD on Wednesday, 03-15-23 10:00AM in House conference room 423 VIA VIDEOCONFERENCE.
|
|
|
House
|
03/09/2023
|
Referred to ECD, CPC, FIN, referral sheet 17
|
|
|
House
|
03/09/2023
|
Pass First Reading
|
|
|
House
|
03/07/2023
|
Received from Senate (Sen. Com. No. 256) in amended form (SD 1).
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/07/2023
|
Report Adopted; Passed Third Reading, as amended (SD 1). Ayes, 24; Aye(s) with reservations: Senator(s) Fevella, Rhoads. Noes, 0 (none). Excused, 1 (Senator(s) Fukunaga). Transmitted to House.
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/03/2023
|
48 Hrs. Notice 03-07-23.
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/03/2023
|
Reported from CPN (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 756) with recommendation of passage on Third Reading, as amended (SD 1).
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/23/2023
|
The committee(s) on CPN recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in CPN were as follows: 5 Aye(s): Senator(s) Keohokalole, Fukunaga, McKelvey, Richards, Awa; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 0 Excused: none.
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/17/2023
|
The committee(s) on CPN will hold a public decision making on 02-23-23 10:00AM; Conference Room 229 & Videoconference.
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/17/2023
|
Report adopted; Passed Second Reading and referred to CPN.
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/17/2023
|
Reported from AEN (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 579) with recommendation of passage on Second Reading and referral to CPN.
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/15/2023
|
The committee(s) on AEN recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes in AEN were as follows: 5 Aye(s): Senator(s) Gabbard, Richards, DeCoite, Awa; Aye(s) with reservations: Senator(s) Rhoads ; 0 No(es): none; and 0 Excused: none.
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/10/2023
|
The committee(s) on AEN has scheduled a public hearing on 02-15-23 1:30PM; Conference Room 224 & Videoconference.
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/08/2023
|
Re-Referred to AEN, CPN.
|
|
|
Senate
|
01/25/2023
|
Referred to AEN/HHS, CPN.
|
|
|
Senate
|
01/23/2023
|
Passed First Reading.
|
|
|
Senate
|
01/20/2023
|
Introduced.
|
|
|