Senate | 02/13/2023 | Report adopted; Passed Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referred to JDC/WAM. | ||
Senate | 02/13/2023 | Reported from WTL (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 171) with recommendation of passage on Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referral to JDC/WAM. | ||
Senate | 02/06/2023 | The committee(s) on WTL recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in WTL were as follows: 5 Aye(s): Senator(s) Inouye, Chang, McKelvey, Fevella; Aye(s) with reservations: Senator(s) Elefante ; 0 No(es): none; and 0 Excused: none. | ||
Senate | 02/03/2023 | The committee(s) on WTL has scheduled a public hearing on 02-06-23 1:05PM; Conference Room 229 & Videoconference. | ||
Senate | 01/20/2023 | Referred to WTL, JDC/WAM. | ||
Senate | 01/18/2023 | Introduced and passed First Reading. | ||
Senate | 01/14/2023 | Pending Introduction. |