House
|
03/30/2023
|
This measure has been deleted from the meeting scheduled on Tuesday 04-04-23 2:00PM in conference room 329 VIA VIDEOCONFERENCE.
|
|
|
House
|
03/30/2023
|
Bill scheduled to be heard by CPC on Tuesday, 04-04-23 2:00PM in House conference room 329 VIA VIDEOCONFERENCE.
|
|
|
House
|
03/24/2023
|
Passed Second Reading as amended in HD 1 and referred to the committee(s) on CPC with Representative(s) Hussey-Burdick, Poepoe voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Ilagan excused (1).
|
|
|
House
|
03/24/2023
|
Reported from TRN (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 1522) as amended in HD 1, recommending passage on Second Reading and referral to CPC.
|
|
|
House
|
03/21/2023
|
The committee on TRN recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 8 Ayes: Representative(s) Todd, Kila, Aiu, Evslin, Hashimoto, Kitagawa, Matsumoto; Ayes with reservations: Representative(s) Onishi; 1 Noes: Representative(s) Marten; and Excused: none.
|
|
|
House
|
03/15/2023
|
Bill scheduled for decision making on Tuesday, 03-21-23 10:30AM in conference room 312 VIA VIDEOCONFERENCE.
|
|
|
House
|
03/14/2023
|
The committee(s) on TRN recommend(s) that the measure be deferred until 03-21-23.
|
|
|
House
|
03/10/2023
|
Bill scheduled to be heard by TRN on Tuesday, 03-14-23 10:00AM in House conference room 312 VIA VIDEOCONFERENCE.
|
|
|
House
|
03/09/2023
|
Referred to TRN, CPC, referral sheet 17
|
|
|
House
|
03/09/2023
|
Pass First Reading
|
|
|
House
|
03/07/2023
|
Received from Senate (Sen. Com. No. 280) in amended form (SD 2).
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/07/2023
|
Report adopted; Passed Third Reading, as amended (SD 2). Ayes, 24; Aye(s) with reservations: none . Noes, 0 (none). Excused, 1 (Senator(s) Fukunaga). Transmitted to House.
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/03/2023
|
48 Hrs. Notice 03-07-23.
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/03/2023
|
Reported from WAM (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 1067) with recommendation of passage on Third Reading, as amended (SD 2).
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/01/2023
|
The committee(s) on WAM recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in WAM were as follows: 13 Aye(s): Senator(s) Dela Cruz, Keith-Agaran, Aquino, DeCoite, Inouye, Kanuha, Kidani, Kim, Lee, Moriwaki, Shimabukuro, Wakai, Fevella; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 0 Excused: none.
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/27/2023
|
The committee(s) on WAM deferred the measure until 03-01-23 9:40AM; Conference Room 211.
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/22/2023
|
The committee(s) on WAM deferred the measure until 02-27-23 10:30AM; Conference Room 211.
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/17/2023
|
The committee(s) on WAM will hold a public decision making on 02-22-23 9:30AM; Conference Room 211 & Videoconference.
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/17/2023
|
Report adopted; Passed Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referred to WAM.
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/17/2023
|
Reported from TCA (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 436) with recommendation of passage on Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referral to WAM.
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/07/2023
|
The committee(s) on TCA recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in TCA were as follows: 4 Aye(s): Senator(s) Lee, Inouye, Keohokalole, Awa; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 1 Excused: Senator(s) Elefante.
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/03/2023
|
The committee(s) on TCA has scheduled a public hearing on 02-07-23 3:00PM; Conference Room 224 & Videoconference.
|
|
|
Senate
|
01/27/2023
|
Referred to TCA, WAM .
|
|
|
Senate
|
01/23/2023
|
Passed First Reading.
|
|
|
Senate
|
01/20/2023
|
Introduced.
|
|
|