Senate | 02/14/2023 | Report adopted; Passed Second Reading and referred to JDC. | ||
Senate | 02/14/2023 | Reported from AEN (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 249) with recommendation of passage on Second Reading and referral to JDC. | ||
Senate | 02/08/2023 | The committee(s) on AEN recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes in AEN were as follows: 5 Aye(s): Senator(s) Gabbard, Richards, DeCoite, Rhoads, Awa; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 0 Excused: none. | ||
Senate | 02/05/2023 | The committee(s) on AEN has scheduled a public hearing on 02-08-23 1:00PM; Conference Room 224 & Videoconference. | ||
Senate | 01/27/2023 | Referred to AEN, JDC. | ||
Senate | 01/23/2023 | Passed First Reading. | ||
Senate | 01/20/2023 | Introduced. |