House
|
03/21/2023
|
The committee(s) on JHA recommend(s) that the measure be deferred.
|
|
|
House
|
03/17/2023
|
Bill scheduled to be heard by JHA on Tuesday, 03-21-23 2:00PM in House conference room 325 VIA VIDEOCONFERENCE.
|
|
|
House
|
03/16/2023
|
Passed Second Reading as amended in HD 1 and referred to the committee(s) on JHA with Representative(s) Hussey-Burdick voting aye with reservations; Representative(s) Kapela voting no (1) and Representative(s) Perruso excused (1).
|
|
|
House
|
03/16/2023
|
Reported from WAL/ECD (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 1243) as amended in HD 1, recommending passage on Second Reading and referral to JHA.
|
|
|
House
|
03/14/2023
|
The committee on ECD recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 7 Ayes: Representative(s) Holt, Lamosao, La Chica, Nakamura, Quinlan; Ayes with reservations: Representative(s) Hussey-Burdick, Pierick; Noes: none; and 1 Excused: Representative(s) Kong.
|
|
|
House
|
03/14/2023
|
The committee on WAL recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 8 Ayes: Representative(s) Ichiyama, Poepoe, Chun, Hashem, Morikawa, Takayama, Souza; Ayes with reservations: Representative(s) Ganaden; Noes: none; and Excused: none.
|
|
|
House
|
03/10/2023
|
Bill scheduled to be heard by WAL/ECD on Tuesday, 03-14-23 11:15AM in House conference room 430 VIA VIDEOCONFERENCE.
|
|
|
House
|
03/09/2023
|
Referred to WAL/ECD, JHA, FIN, referral sheet 17
|
|
|
House
|
03/09/2023
|
Pass First Reading
|
|
|
House
|
03/07/2023
|
Received from Senate (Sen. Com. No. 286) in amended form (SD 1).
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/07/2023
|
Report Adopted; Passed Third Reading, as amended (SD 1). Ayes, 24; Aye(s) with reservations: none. Noes, 1 (Senator(s) Awa). Excused, 0 (none). Transmitted to House.
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/03/2023
|
48 Hrs. Notice 03-07-23.
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/03/2023
|
Reported from JDC (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 1076) with recommendation of passage on Third Reading, as amended (SD 1).
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/24/2023
|
The committee(s) on JDC recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in JDC were as follows: 4 Aye(s): Senator(s) Rhoads, Gabbard, Elefante, San Buenaventura; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 1 No(es): Senator(s) Awa; and 0 Excused: none.
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/21/2023
|
The committee(s) on JDC will hold a public decision making on 02-24-23 9:30AM; Conference Room 016 & Videoconference.
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/14/2023
|
Report adopted; Passed Second Reading and referred to JDC.
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/14/2023
|
Reported from EET (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 214) with recommendation of passage on Second Reading and referral to JDC.
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/07/2023
|
The committee(s) on EET recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes in EET were as follows: 5 Aye(s): Senator(s) DeCoite, Wakai, Fukunaga, Kim, Fevella; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 0 Excused: none.
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/03/2023
|
The committee(s) on EET has scheduled a public hearing on 02-07-23 1:01PM; Conference Room 229 & Videoconference.
|
|
|
Senate
|
01/27/2023
|
Referred to EET, JDC.
|
|
|
Senate
|
01/23/2023
|
Passed First Reading.
|
|
|
Senate
|
01/20/2023
|
Introduced.
|
|
|