House
|
03/09/2023
|
Referred to HET, FIN, referral sheet 17
|
|
|
House
|
03/09/2023
|
Pass First Reading
|
|
|
House
|
03/07/2023
|
Received from Senate (Sen. Com. No. 287) in amended form (SD 1).
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/07/2023
|
Passed Third Reading, as amended (SD 1). Ayes, 24; Aye(s) with reservations: Senator(s) Ihara. Noes, 0 (none). Excused, 1 (Senator(s) Fukunaga). Transmitted to House.
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/03/2023
|
48 Hrs. Notice 03-07-23.
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/03/2023
|
Report adopted; Passed Second Reading, as amended (SD 1).
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/03/2023
|
Reported from HRE/WAM (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 830) with recommendation of passage on Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and placement on the calendar for Third Reading.
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/02/2023
|
The committee(s) on WAM recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in WAM were as follows: 13 Aye(s): Senator(s) Dela Cruz, Keith-Agaran, Aquino, DeCoite, Inouye, Kanuha, Kidani, Kim, Lee, Moriwaki, Shimabukuro, Wakai, Fevella; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 0 Excused: none.
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/02/2023
|
The committee(s) on HRE recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in HRE were as follows: 4 Aye(s): Senator(s) Kim, Kidani, Keith-Agaran, Fevella; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 1 Excused: Senator(s) Fukunaga.
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/02/2023
|
The Committees on HRE/WAM reconsidered their previous action.
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/02/2023
|
The committee(s) on WAM recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes in WAM were as follows: 13 Aye(s): Senator(s) Dela Cruz, Keith-Agaran, Aquino, DeCoite, Inouye, Kanuha, Kidani, Kim, Lee, Moriwaki, Shimabukuro, Wakai, Fevella; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 0 Excused: none.
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/02/2023
|
The committee(s) on HRE recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes in HRE were as follows: 4 Aye(s): Senator(s) Kim, Kidani, Keith-Agaran, Fevella; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 1 Excused: Senator(s) Fukunaga.
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/28/2023
|
The committee(s) on HRE/WAM has scheduled a public hearing on 03-02-23 10:15AM; Conference Room 211 & Videoconference.
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/22/2023
|
Re-Referred to HRE/WAM.
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/21/2023
|
The committee(s) on HRE recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in HRE were as follows: 4 Aye(s): Senator(s) Kim, Kidani, Fevella; Aye(s) with reservations: Senator(s) Fukunaga ; 0 No(es): none; and 1 Excused: Senator(s) Keith-Agaran.
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/16/2023
|
The committee(s) on HRE has scheduled a public hearing on 02-21-23 3:00PM; Conference Room 229 & Videoconference.
|
|
|
Senate
|
01/27/2023
|
Referred to HRE.
|
|
|
Senate
|
01/23/2023
|
Passed First Reading.
|
|
|
Senate
|
01/20/2023
|
Introduced.
|
|
|