Senate | 02/16/2023 | Report adopted; Passed Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referred to WAM. | ||
Senate | 02/16/2023 | Reported from HOU/CPN (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 394) with recommendation of passage on Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referral to WAM. | ||
Senate | 02/10/2023 | The committee(s) on HOU recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in HOU were as follows: 4 Aye(s): Senator(s) Chang, Kanuha, Aquino, Awa; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 1 Excused: Senator(s) Rhoads. | ||
Senate | 02/10/2023 | The committee(s) on CPN recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in CPN were as follows: 5 Aye(s): Senator(s) Keohokalole, Fukunaga, McKelvey, Awa; Aye(s) with reservations: Senator(s) Richards ; 0 No(es): none; and 0 Excused: none. | ||
Senate | 02/07/2023 | The committee(s) on HOU/CPN has scheduled a public hearing on 02-10-23 9:30AM; Conference Room 229 & Videoconference. | ||
Senate | 02/01/2023 | Re-Referred to HOU/CPN, WAM. | ||
Senate | 01/27/2023 | Referred to HOU/CPN, WAM/JDC. | ||
Senate | 01/23/2023 | Passed First Reading. | ||
Senate | 01/20/2023 | Introduced. |