Senate
|
06/21/2023
|
Act 097, 06/21/2023 (Gov. Msg. No. 1198).
|
|
|
House
|
06/21/2023
|
Act 097, on 06/21/2023 (Gov. Msg. No. 1198).
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/05/2023
|
Enrolled to Governor.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/04/2023
|
Received notice of passage on Final Reading in House (Hse. Com. No. 901).
|
|
|
House
|
05/04/2023
|
Received notice of Final Reading (Sen. Com. No. 996).
|
|
|
House
|
05/04/2023
|
Passed Final Reading as amended in CD 1 with none voting aye with reservations; Representative(s) Aiu, Cochran, Hussey-Burdick, Kapela, Kila, Perruso, Poepoe voting no (7) and Representative(s) Lowen, Martinez excused (2).
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/04/2023
|
Passed Final Reading, as amended (CD 1) Ayes, 25; Aye(s) with reservations: none. Noes, 0 (none). Excused, 0 (none).
|
|
|
House
|
05/02/2023
|
Forty-eight (48) hours notice Thursday, 05-04-23.
|
|
|
House
|
05/02/2023
|
Reported from Conference Committee (Conf Com. Rep. No. 180) as amended in (CD 1).
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/02/2023
|
48 Hrs. Notice (as amended CD 1) 05-04-23.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/02/2023
|
Reported from Conference Committee as amended CD 1 (Conf. Com. Rep. No. 180).
|
|
|
House
|
04/28/2023
|
The Conference Committee recommends that the measure be Passed, with Amendments. The votes were as follows: 5 Ayes: Representative(s) Hashimoto, Ichiyama, Aiu, Todd, Matsumoto; Ayes with reservations: none; 0 Noes: none; and 0 Excused: none.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/28/2023
|
The Conference committee recommends that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes of the Senate Conference Managers were as follows: 5 Aye(s): Senator(s) Chang, Inouye, McKelvey, Wakai, Kanuha; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 0 Excused: none.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/28/2023
|
Conference committee meeting to reconvene on 04-28-23 4:45PM; Conference Room 309.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/28/2023
|
Conference committee meeting to reconvene on 04-28-23 3:05PM: Conference Room 224.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/27/2023
|
Conference committee meeting to reconvene on 04-28-23 10:35AM; Conference Room 224.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/26/2023
|
Conference committee meeting to reconvene on 04-27-23 10:35AM; Conference Room 224.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/25/2023
|
Conference committee meeting to reconvene on 04-26-23 10:35AM; Conference Room 224.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/24/2023
|
Conference committee meeting scheduled for 04-25-23 10:45AM; Conference Room 224.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/24/2023
|
Received notice of appointment of House conferees (Hse. Com. No. 840).
|
|
|
House
|
04/21/2023
|
House Conferees Appointed: Hashimoto, Ichiyama, Aiu Co-Chairs; Todd, Matsumoto.
|
|
|
House
|
04/19/2023
|
Received notice of Senate conferees (Sen. Com. No. 911).
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/19/2023
|
Senate Conferees Appointed: Chang Chair; Inouye, McKelvey, Wakai Co-Chairs; Kanuha.
|
|
|
House
|
04/13/2023
|
Received notice of disagreement (Sen. Com. No. 888).
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/13/2023
|
Senate disagrees with House amendments.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/13/2023
|
Received from House (Hse. Com. No. 758).
|
|
|
House
|
04/11/2023
|
Passed Third Reading with Representative(s) Hussey-Burdick voting aye with reservations; Representative(s) Cochran, Kapela, Perruso voting no (3) and Representative(s) Todd excused (1). Transmitted to Senate.
|
|
|
House
|
04/06/2023
|
Reported from FIN (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 2131), recommending passage on Third Reading.
|
|
|
House
|
04/04/2023
|
The committee on FIN recommend that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes were as follows: 12 Ayes: Representative(s) Yamashita, Kitagawa, Aiu, Chun, Garrett, Kahaloa, Kila, Lamosao, Morikawa, Poepoe, Takenouchi, Alcos; Ayes with reservations: none; 2 Noes: Representative(s) Cochran, Kobayashi; and 2 Excused: Representative(s) Nishimoto, Ward.
|
|
|
House
|
03/31/2023
|
Bill scheduled to be heard by FIN on Tuesday, 04-04-23 3:00PM in House conference room 308 VIA VIDEOCONFERENCE.
|
|
|
House
|
03/24/2023
|
Passed Second Reading as amended in HD 1 and referred to the committee(s) on FIN with Representative(s) Hussey-Burdick, Perruso voting aye with reservations; Representative(s) Kapela voting no (1) and Representative(s) Ilagan excused (1).
|
|
|
House
|
03/24/2023
|
Reported from HSG/WAL (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 1481) as amended in HD 1, recommending passage on Second Reading and referral to FIN.
|
|
|
House
|
03/21/2023
|
The committee on WAL recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 8 Ayes: Representative(s) Ichiyama, Poepoe, Chun, Ganaden, Hashem, Morikawa, Takayama; Ayes with reservations: Representative(s) Souza; Noes: none; and Excused: none.
|
|
|
House
|
03/21/2023
|
The committee on HSG recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 8 Ayes: Representative(s) Hashimoto, Aiu, Evslin, Kitagawa, Marten, Todd, Matsumoto; Ayes with reservations: Representative(s) Onishi; Noes: none; and 1 Excused: Representative(s) Kila.
|
|
|
House
|
03/15/2023
|
Bill scheduled to be heard by HSG/WAL on Tuesday, 03-21-23 9:00AM in House conference room 430 VIA VIDEOCONFERENCE.
|
|
|
House
|
03/09/2023
|
Referred to HSG/WAL, FIN, referral sheet 17
|
|
|
House
|
03/09/2023
|
Pass First Reading
|
|
|
House
|
03/07/2023
|
Received from Senate (Sen. Com. No. 293) in amended form (SD 2).
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/07/2023
|
Report adopted; Passed Third Reading, as amended (SD 2). Ayes, 24; Aye(s) with reservations: none . Noes, 0 (none). Excused, 1 (Senator(s) Fukunaga). Transmitted to House.
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/03/2023
|
48 Hrs. Notice 03-07-23.
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/03/2023
|
Reported from WAM (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 1125) with recommendation of passage on Third Reading, as amended (SD 2).
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/03/2023
|
The committee(s) on WAM recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in WAM were as follows: 12 Aye(s): Senator(s) Dela Cruz, Keith-Agaran, Aquino, DeCoite, Inouye, Kanuha, Kidani, Kim, Lee, Moriwaki, Shimabukuro, Wakai; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 1 Excused: Senator(s) Fevella.
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/02/2023
|
The committee(s) on WAM will hold a public decision making on 03-03-23 10:20AM; Conference Room 211 & Videoconference.
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/16/2023
|
Report adopted; Passed Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referred to WAM.
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/16/2023
|
Reported from HOU/WTL/GVO (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 395) with recommendation of passage on Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referral to WAM.
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/07/2023
|
The committee(s) on GVO recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in GVO were as follows: 4 Aye(s): Senator(s) McKelvey, Gabbard, San Buenaventura, Awa; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 1 Excused: Senator(s) Wakai.
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/07/2023
|
The committee(s) on HOU recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in HOU were as follows: 5 Aye(s): Senator(s) Chang, Kanuha, Aquino, Rhoads, Awa; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 0 Excused: none.
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/07/2023
|
The committee(s) on WTL recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in WTL were as follows: 4 Aye(s): Senator(s) Inouye, Elefante, Chang, McKelvey; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 1 Excused: Senator(s) Fevella.
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/03/2023
|
The committee(s) on HOU/WTL/GVO has scheduled a public hearing on 02-07-23 1:15PM; Conference Room 225 & Videoconference.
|
|
|
Senate
|
01/27/2023
|
Referred to HOU/WTL/GVO, WAM.
|
|
|
Senate
|
01/23/2023
|
Passed First Reading.
|
|
|
Senate
|
01/20/2023
|
Introduced.
|
|
|