House
|
03/09/2023
|
Referred to WAL, HSG, FIN, referral sheet 17
|
|
|
House
|
03/09/2023
|
Pass First Reading
|
|
|
House
|
03/07/2023
|
Received from Senate (Sen. Com. No. 295) in amended form (SD 1).
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/07/2023
|
Report Adopted; Passed Third Reading, as amended (SD 1). Ayes, 25; Aye(s) with reservations: Senator(s) Elefante, Ihara, McKelvey. Noes, 0 (none). Excused, 0 (none). Transmitted to House.
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/03/2023
|
48 Hrs. Notice 03-07-23.
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/03/2023
|
Reported from JDC/WAM (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 1111) with recommendation of passage on Third Reading, as amended (SD 1).
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/03/2023
|
The committee(s) on WAM recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in WAM were as follows: 12 Aye(s): Senator(s) Dela Cruz, Keith-Agaran, Aquino, DeCoite, Inouye, Kanuha, Kidani, Kim, Lee, Moriwaki, Shimabukuro, Wakai; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 1 Excused: Senator(s) Fevella.
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/03/2023
|
The committee(s) on JDC recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in JDC were as follows: 5 Aye(s): Senator(s) Rhoads, Gabbard, San Buenaventura, Awa; Aye(s) with reservations: Senator(s) Elefante ; 0 No(es): none; and 0 Excused: none.
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/28/2023
|
The committee(s) on JDC/WAM will hold a public decision making on 03-03-23 10:00AM; Conference Room 211 & Videoconference.
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/16/2023
|
Report adopted; Passed Second Reading and referred to JDC/WAM.
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/16/2023
|
Reported from HOU/PSM (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 397) with recommendation of passage on Second Reading and referral to JDC/WAM.
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/13/2023
|
The committee(s) on PSM recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes in PSM were as follows: 5 Aye(s): Senator(s) Wakai, Awa; Aye(s) with reservations: Senator(s) Elefante, Fukunaga, McKelvey ; 0 No(es): none; and 0 Excused: none.
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/13/2023
|
The committee(s) on HOU recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes in HOU were as follows: 5 Aye(s): Senator(s) Chang, Kanuha, Aquino, Rhoads, Awa; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 0 Excused: none.
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/10/2023
|
The committee(s) on HOU/PSM has scheduled a public hearing on 02-13-23 3:00PM; Conference Room 225 & Videoconference.
|
|
|
Senate
|
01/27/2023
|
Referred to HOU/PSM, JDC/WAM.
|
|
|
Senate
|
01/23/2023
|
Passed First Reading.
|
|
|
Senate
|
01/20/2023
|
Introduced.
|
|
|