Senate
|
02/17/2023
|
Report adopted; Passed Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referred to JDC/WAM.
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/17/2023
|
Reported from HOU/GVO (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 505) with recommendation of passage on Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referral to JDC/WAM.
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/14/2023
|
The committee(s) on GVO recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in GVO were as follows: 5 Aye(s): Senator(s) McKelvey, Gabbard, San Buenaventura, Wakai, Awa; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 0 Excused: none.
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/14/2023
|
The committee(s) on HOU recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in HOU were as follows: 4 Aye(s): Senator(s) Chang, Rhoads, Awa; Aye(s) with reservations: Senator(s) Kanuha ; 0 No(es): none; and 1 Excused: Senator(s) Aquino.
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/07/2023
|
The committee(s) on HOU deferred the measure until 02-14-23 1:00PM; CR 225.
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/07/2023
|
The committee(s) on GVO deferred the measure until 02-14-23 3:00PM; CR 225.
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/03/2023
|
The committee(s) on HOU/GVO has scheduled a public hearing on 02-07-23 1:30PM; Conference Room 225 & Videoconference.
|
|
|
Senate
|
01/31/2023
|
Re-Referred to HOU/GVO, JDC/WAM.
|
|
|
Senate
|
01/27/2023
|
Referred to HOU/GVO, JDC.
|
|
|
Senate
|
01/23/2023
|
Passed First Reading.
|
|
|
Senate
|
01/20/2023
|
Introduced.
|
|
|