Senate
|
06/14/2023
|
Act 087, 06/14/2023 (Gov. Msg. No. 1188).
|
|
|
House
|
06/14/2023
|
Act 087, on 06/14/2023 (Gov. Msg. No. 1188).
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/05/2023
|
Enrolled to Governor.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/04/2023
|
Received notice of passage on Final Reading in House (Hse. Com. No. 901).
|
|
|
House
|
05/04/2023
|
Received notice of Final Reading (Sen. Com. No. 996).
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/04/2023
|
Passed Final Reading, as amended (CD 1). Ayes, 25; Aye(s) with reservations: none . 0 No(es): none. 0 Excused: none.
|
|
|
House
|
05/04/2023
|
Passed Final Reading as amended in CD 1 with none voting aye with reservations; Representative(s) Pierick voting no (1) and Representative(s) Lowen, Martinez excused (2).
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/02/2023
|
Deferred One Day 05-04-23.
|
|
|
House
|
04/28/2023
|
Forty-eight (48) hours notice Tuesday, 05-02-23.
|
|
|
House
|
04/28/2023
|
Reported from Conference Committee (Conf Com. Rep. No. 126) as amended in (CD 1).
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/28/2023
|
48 Hrs. Notice (as amended CD 1) 05-02-23.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/28/2023
|
Reported from Conference Committee as amended CD 1 (Conf. Com. Rep. No. 126).
|
|
|
House
|
04/28/2023
|
The Conference Committee recommends that the measure be Passed, with Amendments. The votes were as follows: 4 Ayes: Representative(s) Mizuno, Kobayashi, Amato, Garcia; Ayes with reservations: none; 0 Noes: none; and 1 Excused: Representative(s) Belatti.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/28/2023
|
The Conference committee recommends that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes of the Senate Conference Managers were as follows: 4 Aye(s): Senator(s) McKelvey, Shimabukuro, Kidani, Aquino; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 1 Excused: Senator(s) Awa.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/27/2023
|
Conference committee meeting to reconvene on 04-28-23 1:31PM; Conference Room 329.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/27/2023
|
Conference committee meeting to reconvene on 04-27-23 4:30PM; Conference Room 329.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/25/2023
|
Conference committee meeting to reconvene on 04-26-23 4:30PM; Conference Room 329.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/24/2023
|
Conference committee meeting scheduled for 04-25-23 4:30PM; Conference Room 329.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/24/2023
|
Received notice of appointment of House conferees (Hse. Com. No. 840).
|
|
|
House
|
04/21/2023
|
House Conferees Appointed: Mizuno, Belatti, Kobayashi Co-Chairs; Amato, Garcia.
|
|
|
House
|
04/20/2023
|
Received notice of Senate conferees (Sen. Com. No. 932).
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/20/2023
|
Senate Conferees Appointed: McKelvey Chair; Shimabukuro, Kidani Co-Chairs; Aquino, Awa.
|
|
|
House
|
04/13/2023
|
Received notice of disagreement (Sen. Com. No. 888).
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/13/2023
|
Senate disagrees with House amendments.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/13/2023
|
Received from House (Hse. Com. No. 759).
|
|
|
House
|
04/11/2023
|
Passed Third Reading as amended in HD 2 with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Martinez, Todd excused (2). Transmitted to Senate.
|
|
|
House
|
04/06/2023
|
Forty-eight (48) hours notice Tuesday, 04-11-23.
|
|
|
House
|
04/06/2023
|
Reported from FIN (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 2139) as amended in HD 2, recommending passage on Third Reading.
|
|
|
House
|
04/05/2023
|
The committee on FIN recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 15 Ayes: Representative(s) Yamashita, Kitagawa, Aiu, Chun, Cochran, Garrett, Kahaloa, Kila, Kobayashi, Lamosao, Morikawa, Poepoe, Takenouchi, Alcos, Ward; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and 1 Excused: Representative(s) Nishimoto.
|
|
|
House
|
04/03/2023
|
Bill scheduled to be heard by FIN on Wednesday, 04-05-23 2:00PM in House conference room 308 VIA VIDEOCONFERENCE.
|
|
|
House
|
03/24/2023
|
Passed Second Reading as amended in HD 1 and referred to the committee(s) on FIN with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Ilagan excused (1).
|
|
|
House
|
03/24/2023
|
Reported from HUS/HLT (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 1487) as amended in HD 1, recommending passage on Second Reading and referral to FIN.
|
|
|
House
|
03/21/2023
|
The committee on HLT recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 7 Ayes: Representative(s) Belatti, Takenouchi, Amato, Ilagan, Kobayashi, Mizuno, Garcia; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and 1 Excused: Representative(s) Nishimoto.
|
|
|
House
|
03/21/2023
|
The committee on HUS recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 7 Ayes: Representative(s) Mizuno, Amato, Belatti, Ilagan, Kobayashi, Takenouchi, Garcia; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and 1 Excused: Representative(s) Nishimoto.
|
|
|
House
|
03/14/2023
|
Bill scheduled to be heard by HUS/HLT on Tuesday, 03-21-23 9:00AM in House conference room 329 VIA VIDEOCONFERENCE.
|
|
|
House
|
03/09/2023
|
Referred to HUS/HLT, FIN, referral sheet 17
|
|
|
House
|
03/09/2023
|
Pass First Reading
|
|
|
House
|
03/07/2023
|
Received from Senate (Sen. Com. No. 301) in amended form (SD 2).
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/07/2023
|
Report adopted; Passed Third Reading, as amended (SD 2). Ayes, 24; Aye(s) with reservations: none . Noes, 0 (none). Excused, 1 (Senator(s) Fukunaga). Transmitted to House.
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/03/2023
|
48 Hrs. Notice 03-07-23.
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/03/2023
|
Reported from WAM (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 892) with recommendation of passage on Third Reading, as amended (SD 2).
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/22/2023
|
The committee(s) on WAM recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in WAM were as follows: 13 Aye(s): Senator(s) Dela Cruz, Keith-Agaran, Aquino, DeCoite, Inouye, Kanuha, Kidani, Kim, Lee, Moriwaki, Shimabukuro, Wakai, Fevella; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 0 Excused: none.
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/16/2023
|
The committee(s) on WAM will hold a public decision making on 02-22-23 10:00AM; Conference Room 211 & Videoconference.
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/13/2023
|
Report adopted; Passed Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referred to WAM.
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/13/2023
|
Reported from GVO/HHS (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 205) with recommendation of passage on Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referral to WAM.
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/07/2023
|
The committee(s) on HHS recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in HHS were as follows: 5 Aye(s): Senator(s) San Buenaventura, Aquino, Moriwaki, Shimabukuro, Awa; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 0 Excused: none.
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/07/2023
|
The committee(s) on GVO recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in GVO were as follows: 5 Aye(s): Senator(s) McKelvey, Gabbard, San Buenaventura, Wakai, Awa; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 0 Excused: none.
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/02/2023
|
The committee(s) on GVO/HHS has scheduled a public hearing on 02-07-23 3:50PM; Conference Room 225 & Videoconference.
|
|
|
Senate
|
01/27/2023
|
Referred to GVO/HHS, WAM.
|
|
|
Senate
|
01/23/2023
|
Passed First Reading.
|
|
|
Senate
|
01/20/2023
|
Introduced.
|
|
|