Senate | 02/17/2023 | Report adopted; Passed Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referred to JDC. | ||
Senate | 02/17/2023 | Reported from HHS/CPN (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 563) with recommendation of passage on Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referral to JDC. | ||
Senate | 02/01/2023 | The committee(s) on HHS recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in HHS were as follows: 4 Aye(s): Senator(s) San Buenaventura, Aquino, Moriwaki, Shimabukuro; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 1 No(es): Senator(s) Awa; and 0 Excused: none. | ||
Senate | 02/01/2023 | The committee(s) on CPN recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in CPN were as follows: 3 Aye(s): Senator(s) Keohokalole, Fukunaga, McKelvey; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 1 No(es): Senator(s) Awa; and 1 Excused: Senator(s) Richards. | ||
Senate | 01/27/2023 | The committee(s) on HHS/CPN added the measure to the public hearing scheduled on 02-01-23 1:10PM; CR 225 & Videoconference. | ||
Senate | 01/27/2023 | Referred to HHS/CPN, JDC. | ||
Senate | 01/23/2023 | Passed First Reading. | ||
Senate | 01/20/2023 | Introduced. |