Senate
|
04/20/2023
|
Act 013, 04/19/2023 (Gov. Msg. No. 1113).
|
|
|
House
|
04/19/2023
|
Act 013, on 04/19/2023 (Gov. Msg. No. 1113).
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/31/2023
|
Enrolled to Governor.
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/31/2023
|
Received from House (Hse. Com. No. 476).
|
|
|
House
|
03/30/2023
|
Passed Third Reading with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Ichiyama, Ilagan, Sayama, Woodson excused (4). Transmitted to Senate.
|
|
|
House
|
03/29/2023
|
Passed Second Reading; placed on the calendar for Third Reading with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and none excused (0).
|
|
|
House
|
03/29/2023
|
Reported from JHA (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 1631), recommending passage on Second Reading and placement on the calendar for Third Reading.
|
|
|
House
|
03/17/2023
|
The committee on JHA recommend that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes were as follows: 7 Ayes: Representative(s) Tarnas, Takayama, Ganaden, Ichiyama, Kong, Mizuno, Souza; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and 3 Excused: Representative(s) Holt, Hashimoto, Ilagan.
|
|
|
House
|
03/15/2023
|
Bill scheduled to be heard by JHA on Friday, 03-17-23 2:00PM in House conference room 325 VIA VIDEOCONFERENCE.
|
|
|
House
|
02/16/2023
|
Referred to JHA, referral sheet 15
|
|
|
House
|
02/06/2023
|
Pass First Reading
|
|
|
House
|
02/03/2023
|
Received from Senate (Sen. Com. No. 6).
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/03/2023
|
Passed Third Reading, as amended (SD 1). Ayes, 25; Aye(s) with reservations: none . Noes, 0 (none). Excused, 0 (none). Transmitted to House.
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/01/2023
|
48 Hrs. Notice 02-03-23.
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/01/2023
|
Report adopted; Passed Second Reading, as amended (SD 1).
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/01/2023
|
Reported from JDC (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 3) with recommendation of passage on Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and placement on the calendar for Third Reading.
|
|
|
Senate
|
01/27/2023
|
The committee(s) on JDC recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in JDC were as follows: 5 Aye(s): Senator(s) Rhoads, Gabbard, Elefante, San Buenaventura, Awa; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 0 Excused: none.
|
|
|
Senate
|
01/23/2023
|
The committee(s) on JDC has scheduled a public hearing on 01-27-23 10:00AM; CR 016 & Videoconference.
|
|
|
Senate
|
01/20/2023
|
Referred to JDC.
|
|
|
Senate
|
01/18/2023
|
Introduced and passed First Reading.
|
|
|
Senate
|
01/12/2023
|
Pending Introduction.
|
|
|