House
|
04/24/2023
|
Received notice of Senate conferees (Sen. Com. No. 976).
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/24/2023
|
Senate Conferees Appointed: Rhoads Chair; Gabbard, Awa.
|
|
|
House
|
04/04/2023
|
Received notice of disagreement (Sen. Com. No. 557).
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/04/2023
|
Senate disagrees with House amendments.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/04/2023
|
Received from House (Hse. Com. No. 556).
|
|
|
House
|
04/03/2023
|
Passed Third Reading with Representative(s) Chun, Matayoshi voting aye with reservations; Representative(s) Aiu, Alcos, Garcia, Gates, Holt, Kila, Lamosao, Matsumoto, Poepoe, Quinlan, Souza, Tam, Ward voting no (13) and Representative(s) Nishimoto excused (1). Transmitted to Senate.
|
|
|
House
|
03/31/2023
|
Deferred one day 04-03-23.
|
|
|
House
|
03/29/2023
|
Passed Second Reading as amended in HD 1; placed on the calendar for Third Reading with Representative(s) Matsumoto voting aye with reservations; Representative(s) Alcos, Garcia, Souza, Ward voting no (4) and none excused (0).
|
|
|
House
|
03/29/2023
|
Reported from JHA (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 1618) as amended in HD 1, recommending passage on Second Reading and placement on the calendar for Third Reading.
|
|
|
House
|
03/16/2023
|
The committee on JHA recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 8 Ayes: Representative(s) Tarnas, Takayama, Ganaden, Hashimoto, Ichiyama, Ilagan, Kong, Mizuno; Ayes with reservations: none; 1 Noes: Representative(s) Souza; and 1 Excused: Representative(s) Holt.
|
|
|
House
|
03/14/2023
|
Bill scheduled to be heard by JHA on Thursday, 03-16-23 2:00PM in House conference room 325 VIA VIDEOCONFERENCE.
|
|
|
House
|
03/09/2023
|
Referred to JHA, referral sheet 17
|
|
|
House
|
03/09/2023
|
Pass First Reading
|
|
|
House
|
03/07/2023
|
Received from Senate (Sen. Com. No. 309) in amended form (SD 1).
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/07/2023
|
Passed Third Reading, as amended (SD 1). Ayes, 21; Aye(s) with reservations: Senator(s) Aquino, Keohokalole, McKelvey. Noes, 3 (Senator(s) Elefante, Fevella, Moriwaki). Excused, 1 (Senator(s) Fukunaga). Transmitted to House.
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/03/2023
|
48 Hrs. Notice 03-07-23.
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/03/2023
|
Report adopted; Passed Second Reading, as amended (SD 1).
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/03/2023
|
Reported from JDC (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 806) with recommendation of passage on Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and placement on the calendar for Third Reading.
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/16/2023
|
The committee(s) on JDC recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in JDC were as follows: 4 Aye(s): Senator(s) Rhoads, Gabbard, San Buenaventura, Awa; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 1 No(es): Senator(s) Elefante; and 0 Excused: none.
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/13/2023
|
The committee(s) on JDC has scheduled a public hearing on 02-16-23 9:30AM; Conference Room 016 & Videoconference.
|
|
|
Senate
|
01/27/2023
|
Referred to JDC.
|
|
|
Senate
|
01/23/2023
|
Passed First Reading.
|
|
|
Senate
|
01/20/2023
|
Introduced.
|
|
|