Hawaii 2023 Regular Session

Hawaii Senate Bill SB944 Compare Versions

OldNewDifferences
1-THE SENATE S.B. NO. 944 THIRTY-SECOND LEGISLATURE, 2023 S.D. 1 STATE OF HAWAII A BILL FOR AN ACT RELATING TO THE UNIFORM PARENTAGE ACT. BE IT ENACTED BY THE LEGISLATURE OF THE STATE OF HAWAII:
1+THE SENATE S.B. NO. 944 THIRTY-SECOND LEGISLATURE, 2023 STATE OF HAWAII A BILL FOR AN ACT RELATING TO THE UNIFORM PARENTAGE ACT. BE IT ENACTED BY THE LEGISLATURE OF THE STATE OF HAWAII:
22
33 THE SENATE S.B. NO. 944
4-THIRTY-SECOND LEGISLATURE, 2023 S.D. 1
4+THIRTY-SECOND LEGISLATURE, 2023
55 STATE OF HAWAII
66
77 THE SENATE
88
99 S.B. NO.
1010
1111 944
1212
1313 THIRTY-SECOND LEGISLATURE, 2023
1414
15-S.D. 1
15+
1616
1717 STATE OF HAWAII
1818
1919
2020
2121
2222
2323
2424
2525
2626
2727
2828
2929
3030
3131 A BILL FOR AN ACT
3232
3333
3434
3535
3636
3737 RELATING TO THE UNIFORM PARENTAGE ACT.
3838
3939
4040
4141
4242
4343 BE IT ENACTED BY THE LEGISLATURE OF THE STATE OF HAWAII:
4444
4545
4646
47- SECTION 1. (a) The department of health and the department of the attorney general shall convene a task force to recommend amendments to the Hawaii Revised Statutes to update existing parentage laws that reflect outdated, cisheteronormative concepts of families, parenthood, and parental rights. (b) The task force shall include the following members: (1) The director of health, or the director's designee, who shall serve as a co-chairperson; and (2) A representative from the department of the attorney general, who shall serve as a co-chairperson. (c) The director of health and the representative from the department of the attorney general shall invite the following individuals to become members of the task force: (1) A family court judge; (2) A family law attorney; (3) A representative of AF3IRM Hawaii; (4) A representative of the department of health's sexual and gender minority working group; (5) A representative of Ka Aha Mahu; and (6) Any other member as recommended by the task force. (d) The task force shall submit a report of its findings and recommendations, including any proposed legislation, to the legislature no later than forty days prior to the convening of the regular session of 2025. (e) The task force shall be dissolved on December 31, 2025. SECTION 2. This Act shall take effect on March 22, 2075.
47+ SECTION 1. Act 201, Session Laws of Hawaii 2021, is amended by amending section 2 to read as follows: "SECTION 2. (a) The department of health and the department of the attorney general shall convene a task force to recommend amendments to the Hawaii Revised Statutes to update existing parentage laws that reflect outdated, cisheteronormative concepts of families, parenthood, and parental rights. (b) The task force shall include the following members: (1) The director of health, or the director's designee, who shall serve as [chairperson;] a co-chairperson; and (2) A representative from the department of the attorney general[.], who shall serve as a co-chairperson. (c) The director of health and the representative from the department of the attorney general shall invite the following individuals to become members of the task force: (1) A family court judge; (2) A family law attorney; (3) A representative of AF3IRM Hawaii; (4) A representative of the department of health's sexual and gender minority working group; (5) A representative of Ka Aha Mahu; and (6) Any other member as recommended by the task force. (d) The task force shall submit a report of its findings and recommendations, including any proposed legislation, to the legislature no later than [twenty] forty days prior to the convening of the regular session of [2022.] 2024. (e) The task force shall be dissolved on [June 30, 2022.] December 31, 2024." SECTION 2. Statutory material to be repealed is bracketed and stricken. New statutory material is underscored. SECTION 3. This Act shall take effect upon its approval. INTRODUCED BY: _____________________________
4848
49- SECTION 1. (a) The department of health and the department of the attorney general shall convene a task force to recommend amendments to the Hawaii Revised Statutes to update existing parentage laws that reflect outdated, cisheteronormative concepts of families, parenthood, and parental rights.
49+ SECTION 1. Act 201, Session Laws of Hawaii 2021, is amended by amending section 2 to read as follows:
50+
51+ "SECTION 2. (a) The department of health and the department of the attorney general shall convene a task force to recommend amendments to the Hawaii Revised Statutes to update existing parentage laws that reflect outdated, cisheteronormative concepts of families, parenthood, and parental rights.
5052
5153 (b) The task force shall include the following members:
5254
53- (1) The director of health, or the director's designee, who shall serve as a co-chairperson; and
55+ (1) The director of health, or the director's designee, who shall serve as [chairperson;] a co-chairperson; and
5456
55- (2) A representative from the department of the attorney general, who shall serve as a co-chairperson.
57+ (2) A representative from the department of the attorney general[.], who shall serve as a co-chairperson.
5658
5759 (c) The director of health and the representative from the department of the attorney general shall invite the following individuals to become members of the task force:
5860
5961 (1) A family court judge;
6062
6163 (2) A family law attorney;
6264
6365 (3) A representative of AF3IRM Hawaii;
6466
6567 (4) A representative of the department of health's sexual and gender minority working group;
6668
6769 (5) A representative of Ka Aha Mahu; and
6870
6971 (6) Any other member as recommended by the task force.
7072
71- (d) The task force shall submit a report of its findings and recommendations, including any proposed legislation, to the legislature no later than forty days prior to the convening of the regular session of 2025.
73+ (d) The task force shall submit a report of its findings and recommendations, including any proposed legislation, to the legislature no later than [twenty] forty days prior to the convening of the regular session of [2022.] 2024.
7274
73- (e) The task force shall be dissolved on December 31, 2025.
75+ (e) The task force shall be dissolved on [June 30, 2022.] December 31, 2024."
7476
75- SECTION 2. This Act shall take effect on March 22, 2075.
77+ SECTION 2. Statutory material to be repealed is bracketed and stricken. New statutory material is underscored.
7678
77- Report Title: Uniform Parentage Act; Task Force; Report; Establishment Description: Establishes a task force to recommend amendments to update existing parentage laws that reflect outdated, cisheteronormative concepts of families, parenthood, and parental rights. Requires a report to the Legislature within forty days from the 2025 Regular Session. Takes effect 03/22/2075. (SD1) The summary description of legislation appearing on this page is for informational purposes only and is not legislation or evidence of legislative intent.
79+ SECTION 3. This Act shall take effect upon its approval.
80+
81+
82+
83+INTRODUCED BY: _____________________________
84+
85+INTRODUCED BY:
86+
87+_____________________________
88+
89+
90+
91+
92+
93+
94+
95+
96+
97+
98+
99+
100+
101+
102+
103+
104+
105+ Report Title: Uniform Parentage Act; Task Force; Extension Description: Extends and modifies the task force established to recommend amendments to update existing parentage laws that reflect outdated, cisheteronormative concepts of families, parenthood, and parental rights to December 31, 2024. The summary description of legislation appearing on this page is for informational purposes only and is not legislation or evidence of legislative intent.
78106
79107
80108
81109
82110
83111 Report Title:
84112
85-Uniform Parentage Act; Task Force; Report; Establishment
113+Uniform Parentage Act; Task Force; Extension
86114
87115
88116
89117 Description:
90118
91-Establishes a task force to recommend amendments to update existing parentage laws that reflect outdated, cisheteronormative concepts of families, parenthood, and parental rights. Requires a report to the Legislature within forty days from the 2025 Regular Session. Takes effect 03/22/2075. (SD1)
119+Extends and modifies the task force established to recommend amendments to update existing parentage laws that reflect outdated, cisheteronormative concepts of families, parenthood, and parental rights to December 31, 2024.
92120
93121
94122
95123
96124
97125
98126
99127 The summary description of legislation appearing on this page is for informational purposes only and is not legislation or evidence of legislative intent.