LegiPlex
AI Workspace & Legislation Tracker
New Workspace
About
Sign Up
Login
Research Tools
Keyword Search
Bill Content
Videos & Transcripts
Capitol Directory
US
Hawaii HI
Legislatures
2023 Regular Session
Senate
Bills
SB95
Action History
HI
Hawaii Senate Bill SB95
Overview
Authors & Sponsors
Activity Timeline
Action History
Meeting Schedule
Draft Versions & Texts
Latest Draft
Compare Versions
Committee Assignments
Hawaii 2023 Regular Session
Hawaii Senate Bill SB95
Action History
Senate
02/13/2023
The committee on JDC deferred the measure.
Senate
02/13/2023
The committee on HHS deferred the measure.
Senate
02/09/2023
The committee(s) on HHS/JDC has scheduled a public hearing on 02-13-23 10:30AM; Conference Room 016 & Videoconference.
Senate
01/20/2023
Referred to HHS/JDC, WAM.
Senate
01/18/2023
Introduced and passed First Reading.
Senate
01/17/2023
Pending Introduction.