Senate | 02/16/2023 | Report adopted; Passed Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referred to JDC/WAM. | ||
Senate | 02/16/2023 | Reported from GVO (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 370) with recommendation of passage on Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referral to JDC/WAM. | ||
Senate | 02/09/2023 | The committee(s) on GVO recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in GVO were as follows: 4 Aye(s): Senator(s) McKelvey, Gabbard, Wakai, Awa; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 1 Excused: Senator(s) San Buenaventura. | ||
Senate | 02/03/2023 | The committee(s) on GVO has scheduled a public hearing on 02-09-23 3:00PM; Conference Room 225 & Videoconference. | ||
Senate | 01/27/2023 | Referred to GVO, JDC/WAM. | ||
Senate | 01/23/2023 | Passed First Reading. | ||
Senate | 01/20/2023 | Introduced. |