Senate
|
05/22/2023
|
Certified copies of resolutions sent.
|
|
|
House
|
04/28/2023
|
Received notice of Senate agreement and Adoption (Sen. Com No. 992).
|
|
|
House
|
04/28/2023
|
Received notice of reconsideration (Sen. Com. No. 992).
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/28/2023
|
Resolution adopted in final form.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/27/2023
|
One Day Notice 04-28-23.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/27/2023
|
Senate agrees with House Amendments. Placed on the calendar for Final Adoption on 04-28-23.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/27/2023
|
Reconsideration of action taken on 04-25-23 in disagreeing to the House amendments.
|
|
|
House
|
04/25/2023
|
Received notice of disagreement (Sen. Com. No. 981).
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/25/2023
|
Senate disagrees with House amendments.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/25/2023
|
Received from House (Hse. Com. No. 845).
|
|
|
House
|
04/24/2023
|
Transmitted to Senate.
|
|
|
House
|
04/24/2023
|
Adopted with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and none excused (0).
|
|
|
House
|
04/24/2023
|
Reported from FIN (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 2246), recommending adoption.
|
|
|
House
|
04/19/2023
|
The committee on FIN recommend that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes were as follows: 12 Ayes: Representative(s) Yamashita, Kitagawa, Aiu, Chun, Cochran, Garrett, Kahaloa, Lamosao, Morikawa, Poepoe, Takenouchi, Alcos; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and 4 Excused: Representative(s) Kila, Kobayashi, Nishimoto, Ward.
|
|
|
House
|
04/17/2023
|
Scheduled for decision making on Wednesday, 04-19-23 2:00PM in conference room 308 VIA VIDEOCONFERENCE.
|
|
|
House
|
04/17/2023
|
Report adopted. referred to the committee(s) on FIN as amended in HD 1 with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Lowen, Nakashima excused (2).
|
|
|
House
|
04/17/2023
|
Reported from CAI (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 2203) as amended in HD 1, recommending referral to FIN.
|
|
|
House
|
04/14/2023
|
The committee on CAI recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 5 Ayes: Representative(s) Tam, Martinez, Garrett, Kapela, Matayoshi; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and 2 Excused: Representative(s) Sayama, Alcos.
|
|
|
House
|
04/11/2023
|
Resolution scheduled to be heard by CAI on Friday, 04-14-23 10:40AM in conference room 309 VIA VIDEOCONFERENCE.
|
|
|
House
|
04/11/2023
|
Re-referred to CAI, FIN, referral sheet 29
|
|
|
House
|
04/11/2023
|
Referred to CAI/CMV, FIN, referral sheet 28
|
|
|
House
|
04/04/2023
|
Received from Senate (Sen. Com. No. 547).
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/04/2023
|
Report and Resolution Adopted. Transmitted to House.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/03/2023
|
One Day Notice 04-04-23.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/03/2023
|
Reported from TCA/PSM (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 1489) with recommendation of adoption.
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/21/2023
|
The committee(s) on PSM recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes in PSM were as follows: 3 Aye(s): Senator(s) Wakai, Elefante, Awa; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 2 Excused: Senator(s) Fukunaga, McKelvey.
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/21/2023
|
The committee(s) on TCA recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes in TCA were as follows: 4 Aye(s): Senator(s) Lee, Elefante, Keohokalole, Awa; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 1 Excused: Senator(s) Inouye.
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/17/2023
|
The committee(s) on TCA/PSM added the measure to the public hearing scheduled on 03-21-23 3:01PM; CR 224 & Videoconference.
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/15/2023
|
Referred to TCA/PSM.
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/10/2023
|
Offered.
|
|
|