Senate
|
05/22/2023
|
Certified copies of resolutions sent.
|
|
|
House
|
04/28/2023
|
Received notice of Senate agreement and Adoption (Sen. Com No. 992).
|
|
|
House
|
04/28/2023
|
Received notice of reconsideration (Sen. Com. No. 992).
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/28/2023
|
Resolution adopted in final form.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/27/2023
|
One Day Notice 04-28-23.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/27/2023
|
Senate agrees with House Amendments. Placed on the calendar for Final Adoption on 04-28-23.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/27/2023
|
Reconsideration of action taken on 04-25-23 in disagreeing to the House amendments.
|
|
|
House
|
04/25/2023
|
Received notice of disagreement (Sen. Com. No. 981).
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/25/2023
|
Senate disagrees with House amendments.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/25/2023
|
Received from House (Hse. Com. No. 846).
|
|
|
House
|
04/24/2023
|
Transmitted to Senate.
|
|
|
House
|
04/24/2023
|
Adopted with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and none excused (0).
|
|
|
House
|
04/24/2023
|
Reported from FIN (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 2243), recommending adoption.
|
|
|
House
|
04/19/2023
|
The committee on FIN recommend that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes were as follows: 12 Ayes: Representative(s) Yamashita, Kitagawa, Aiu, Chun, Cochran, Garrett, Kahaloa, Lamosao, Morikawa, Poepoe, Takenouchi, Alcos; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and 4 Excused: Representative(s) Kila, Kobayashi, Nishimoto, Ward.
|
|
|
House
|
04/18/2023
|
Scheduled for decision making on Wednesday, 04-19-23 2:00PM in conference room 308 VIA VIDEOCONFERENCE.
|
|
|
House
|
04/17/2023
|
Report adopted. referred to the committee(s) on FIN as amended in HD 1 with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Lowen, Nakashima excused (2).
|
|
|
House
|
04/17/2023
|
Reported from JHA (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 2155) as amended in HD 1, recommending referral to FIN.
|
|
|
House
|
04/13/2023
|
The committee on JHA recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 7 Ayes: Representative(s) Tarnas, Takayama, Ganaden, Holt, Kong, Mizuno, Souza; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and 3 Excused: Representative(s) Hashimoto, Ichiyama, Ilagan.
|
|
|
House
|
04/11/2023
|
Resolution scheduled to be heard by JHA on Thursday, 04-13-23 2:00PM in conference room 325 VIA VIDEOCONFERENCE.
|
|
|
House
|
04/11/2023
|
Referred to JHA, FIN, referral sheet 28
|
|
|
House
|
04/05/2023
|
Received from Senate (Sen. Com. No. 603) in amended form (SD 1).
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/05/2023
|
Report and Resolution Adopted, as amended (SD 1). Transmitted to House.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/04/2023
|
One Day Notice 04-05-23.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/04/2023
|
Reported from PSM/HWN (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 1562) with recommendation of adoption, as amended (SD 1).
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/29/2023
|
The committee(s) on HWN recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in HWN were as follows: 3 Aye(s): Senator(s) Shimabukuro, Fevella, Keohokalole; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 2 Excused: Senator(s) Ihara, Richards.
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/29/2023
|
The committee(s) on PSM recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in PSM were as follows: 4 Aye(s): Senator(s) Elefante, Fukunaga, McKelvey, Awa; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 1 Excused: Senator(s) Wakai.
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/22/2023
|
The committee(s) on PSM/HWN has scheduled a public hearing on 03-29-23 3:00PM; Conference Room 225 & Videoconference.
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/15/2023
|
Referred to PSM/HWN.
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/10/2023
|
Offered.
|
|
|