Senate
|
05/22/2023
|
Certified copies of resolutions sent.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/18/2023
|
Resolution adopted in final form.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/18/2023
|
Received from House (Hse. Com. No. 816).
|
|
|
House
|
04/17/2023
|
Transmitted to Senate.
|
|
|
House
|
04/17/2023
|
Adopted with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Lowen, Nakashima excused (2).
|
|
|
House
|
04/17/2023
|
Reported from HLT (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 2224), recommending adoption.
|
|
|
House
|
04/14/2023
|
The committee on HLT recommend that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes were as follows: 7 Ayes: Representative(s) Belatti, Takenouchi, Amato, Ilagan, Kobayashi, Nishimoto, Garcia; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and 1 Excused: Representative(s) Mizuno.
|
|
|
House
|
04/11/2023
|
Resolution scheduled to be heard by HLT on Friday, 04-14-23 11:15AM in conference room 329 VIA VIDEOCONFERENCE.
|
|
|
House
|
04/11/2023
|
Referred to HLT, referral sheet 28
|
|
|
House
|
04/05/2023
|
Received from Senate (Sen. Com. No. 604).
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/05/2023
|
Report and Resolution Adopted. Transmitted to House.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/04/2023
|
One Day Notice 04-05-23.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/04/2023
|
Reported from PSM/HHS (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 1579) with recommendation of adoption.
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/24/2023
|
The committee(s) on HHS recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes in HHS were as follows: 4 Aye(s): Senator(s) Aquino, Moriwaki, Shimabukuro, Awa; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 1 Excused: Senator(s) San Buenaventura.
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/24/2023
|
The committee(s) on PSM recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes in PSM were as follows: 4 Aye(s): Senator(s) Wakai, Elefante, McKelvey, Awa; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 1 Excused: Senator(s) Fukunaga.
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/21/2023
|
The committee(s) on PSM/HHS has scheduled a public hearing on 03-24-23 2:00PM; Conference Room 225 & Videoconference.
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/15/2023
|
Referred to PSM/HHS.
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/10/2023
|
Offered.
|
|
|