House
|
04/17/2023
|
Report adopted; referred to the committee(s) on FIN with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Lowen, Nakashima excused (2).
|
|
|
House
|
04/17/2023
|
Reported from AGR (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 2194), recommending referral to FIN.
|
|
|
House
|
04/13/2023
|
The committee on AGR recommend that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes were as follows: 6 Ayes: Representative(s) Gates, Kahaloa, Cochran, Lowen, Woodson, Ward; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and 1 Excused: Representative(s) Perruso.
|
|
|
House
|
04/13/2023
|
Resolution scheduled to be heard by AGR on Thursday, 04-13-23 1:00PM in conference room 312 VIA VIDEOCONFERENCE.
|
|
|
House
|
04/11/2023
|
Referred to AGR, FIN, referral sheet 28
|
|
|
House
|
04/05/2023
|
Received from Senate (Sen. Com. No. 605).
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/05/2023
|
Report and Resolution Adopted. Transmitted to House.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/04/2023
|
One Day Notice 04-05-23.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/04/2023
|
Reported from AEN (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 1644) with recommendation of adoption.
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/29/2023
|
The committee(s) on AEN recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes in AEN were as follows: 5 Aye(s): Senator(s) Gabbard, Richards, DeCoite, Rhoads, Awa; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 0 Excused: none.
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/22/2023
|
The committee(s) on AEN has scheduled a public hearing on 03-29-23 1:01PM; Conference Room 224 & Videoconference.
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/15/2023
|
Referred to AEN.
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/10/2023
|
Offered.
|
|
|