House | 04/11/2023 | Referred to CAI/LMG, FIN, referral sheet 28 | ||
House | 04/05/2023 | Received from Senate (Sen. Com. No. 610) in amended form (SD 1). | ||
Senate | 04/05/2023 | Report and Resolution Adopted, as amended (SD 1). Transmitted to House. | ||
Senate | 04/04/2023 | One Day Notice 04-05-23. | ||
Senate | 04/04/2023 | Reported from GVO/TCA (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 1631) with recommendation of adoption, as amended (SD 1). | ||
Senate | 03/28/2023 | The committee(s) on GVO recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in GVO were as follows: 5 Aye(s): Senator(s) McKelvey, Gabbard, San Buenaventura, Wakai, Awa; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 0 Excused: none. | ||
Senate | 03/28/2023 | The committee(s) on TCA recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in TCA were as follows: 5 Aye(s): Senator(s) Lee, Inouye, Elefante, Keohokalole, Awa; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 0 Excused: none. | ||
Senate | 03/24/2023 | The committee(s) on GVO/TCA has scheduled a public hearing on 03-28-23 3:45PM; Conference Room 224 & Videoconference. | ||
Senate | 03/15/2023 | Referred to GVO/TCA. | ||
Senate | 03/10/2023 | Offered. |