House
|
04/17/2023
|
Report adopted. referred to the committee(s) on FIN as amended in HD 1 with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Lowen, Nakashima excused (2).
|
|
|
House
|
04/17/2023
|
Reported from CPC (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 2157) as amended in HD 1, recommending referral to FIN.
|
|
|
House
|
04/13/2023
|
The committee on CPC recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 7 Ayes: Representative(s) Nakashima, Sayama, Amato, Hashem, Onishi, Tam, Pierick; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and 4 Excused: Representative(s) Belatti, Hussey-Burdick, Gates, Lowen.
|
|
|
House
|
04/11/2023
|
Resolution scheduled to be heard by CPC on Thursday, 04-13-23 2:15PM in conference room 329 VIA VIDEOCONFERENCE.
|
|
|
House
|
04/11/2023
|
Referred to CPC, FIN, referral sheet 28
|
|
|
House
|
04/05/2023
|
Received from Senate (Sen. Com. No. 615) in amended form (SD 1).
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/05/2023
|
Report and Resolution Adopted, as amended (SD 1). Transmitted to House.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/04/2023
|
One Day Notice 04-05-23.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/04/2023
|
Reported from CPN (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 1696) with recommendation of adoption, as amended (SD 1).
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/21/2023
|
The committee(s) on CPN recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in CPN were as follows: 5 Aye(s): Senator(s) Keohokalole, Fukunaga, McKelvey, Richards, Awa; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 0 Excused: none.
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/17/2023
|
The committee(s) on CPN has scheduled a public hearing on 03-21-23 9:55AM; Conference Room 229 & Videoconference.
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/15/2023
|
Referred to CPN.
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/10/2023
|
Offered.
|
|
|