House
|
04/17/2023
|
Report adopted; referred to the committee(s) on FIN with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Lowen, Nakashima excused (2).
|
|
|
House
|
04/17/2023
|
Reported from EEP (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 2186), recommending referral to FIN.
|
|
|
House
|
04/13/2023
|
The committee on EEP recommend that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes were as follows: 6 Ayes: Representative(s) Lowen, Cochran, Gates, Kahaloa, Perruso, Woodson; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and 1 Excused: Representative(s) Ward.
|
|
|
House
|
04/11/2023
|
Resolution scheduled to be heard by EEP on Thursday, 04-13-23 9:15AM in conference room 325 VIA VIDEOCONFERENCE.
|
|
|
House
|
04/11/2023
|
Referred to EEP, FIN, referral sheet 28
|
|
|
House
|
04/05/2023
|
Received from Senate (Sen. Com. No. 618).
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/05/2023
|
Report and Resolution Adopted. Transmitted to House.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/04/2023
|
One Day Notice 04-05-23.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/04/2023
|
Reported from AEN (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 1652) with recommendation of adoption.
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/22/2023
|
The committee(s) on AEN recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes in AEN were as follows: 5 Aye(s): Senator(s) Gabbard, Richards, DeCoite, Rhoads, Awa; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 0 Excused: none.
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/17/2023
|
The committee(s) on AEN has scheduled a public hearing on 03-22-23 1:30PM; Conference Room 224 & Videoconference.
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/15/2023
|
Referred to AEN.
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/10/2023
|
Offered.
|
|
|