House
|
04/17/2023
|
Report adopted; referred to the committee(s) on FIN with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Lowen, Nakashima excused (2).
|
|
|
House
|
04/17/2023
|
Reported from HET (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 2168), recommending referral to FIN.
|
|
|
House
|
04/13/2023
|
The committee on HET recommend that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes were as follows: 9 Ayes: Representative(s) Perruso, Kapela, Evslin, La Chica, Marten, Martinez, Matayoshi, Woodson, Garcia; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and 2 Excused: Representative(s) Quinlan, Todd.
|
|
|
House
|
04/12/2023
|
Scheduled for decision making on Thursday, 04-13-23 2:05PM in conference room 309 VIA VIDEOCONFERENCE.
|
|
|
House
|
04/12/2023
|
The committee(s) on HET recommend(s) that the measure be deferred until 04-13-23.
|
|
|
House
|
04/11/2023
|
Resolution scheduled to be heard by HET on Wednesday, 04-12-23 2:00PM in conference room 309 VIA VIDEOCONFERENCE.
|
|
|
House
|
04/11/2023
|
Referred to HET, FIN, referral sheet 28
|
|
|
House
|
04/05/2023
|
Received from Senate (Sen. Com. No. 619) in amended form (SD 1).
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/05/2023
|
Report and Resolution Adopted, as amended (SD 1). Transmitted to House.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/04/2023
|
One Day Notice 04-05-23.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/04/2023
|
Reported from HRE/AEN (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 1551) with recommendation of adoption, as amended (SD 1).
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/30/2023
|
The committee(s) on HRE recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in HRE were as follows: 3 Aye(s): Senator(s) Kim, Kidani, Fevella; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 2 Excused: Senator(s) Fukunaga, Keith-Agaran.
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/30/2023
|
The committee(s) on AEN recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in AEN were as follows: 4 Aye(s): Senator(s) Gabbard, DeCoite, Rhoads, Awa; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 1 Excused: Senator(s) Richards.
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/24/2023
|
The committee(s) on HRE/AEN has scheduled a public hearing on 03-30-23 3:00PM; Conference Room 229 & Videoconference.
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/15/2023
|
Referred to HRE/AEN.
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/10/2023
|
Offered.
|
|
|