Senate
|
05/22/2023
|
Certified copies of resolutions sent.
|
|
|
House
|
05/04/2023
|
Received notice of Adoption (Sen. Com. No. 999).
|
|
|
House
|
05/04/2023
|
Received notice of reconsideration and Senate agreement (Sen. Com. No. 999).
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/04/2023
|
Resolution adopted in final form.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/02/2023
|
One Day Notice 05-04-23.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/02/2023
|
Senate agrees with House Amendments. Placed on the calendar for Final Adoption on 05-04-23.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/02/2023
|
Reconsideration of action taken on 04-25-23 in disagreeing to the House amendments.
|
|
|
House
|
04/25/2023
|
Received notice of disagreement (Sen. Com. No. 981).
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/25/2023
|
Senate disagrees with House amendments.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/25/2023
|
Received from House (Hse. Com. No. 842).
|
|
|
House
|
04/24/2023
|
Transmitted to Senate.
|
|
|
House
|
04/24/2023
|
Adopted with none voting aye with reservations; Representative(s) Alcos, Garcia, Kong, Matsumoto, Pierick, Ward voting no (6) and none excused (0).
|
|
|
House
|
04/24/2023
|
Reported from FIN (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 2254), recommending adoption.
|
|
|
House
|
04/19/2023
|
The committee on FIN recommend that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes were as follows: 12 Ayes: Representative(s) Yamashita, Kitagawa, Aiu, Chun, Cochran, Garrett, Kahaloa, Lamosao, Morikawa, Poepoe, Takenouchi, Alcos; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and 4 Excused: Representative(s) Kila, Kobayashi, Nishimoto, Ward.
|
|
|
House
|
04/18/2023
|
Scheduled for decision making on Wednesday, 04-19-23 2:00PM in conference room 308 VIA VIDEOCONFERENCE.
|
|
|
House
|
04/17/2023
|
Report adopted. referred to the committee(s) on FIN as amended in HD 1 with none voting aye with reservations; Representative(s) Alcos, Garcia, Matsumoto, Pierick voting no (4) and Representative(s) Lowen, Nakashima excused (2).
|
|
|
House
|
04/17/2023
|
Reported from CPC/LMG (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 2164) as amended in HD 1, recommending referral to FIN.
|
|
|
House
|
04/13/2023
|
The committee on LMG recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 5 Ayes: Representative(s) Nakamura, Morikawa, Ilagan, Kitagawa; Ayes with reservations: Representative(s) Matsumoto; Noes: none; and Excused: none.
|
|
|
House
|
04/13/2023
|
The committee on CPC recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 6 Ayes: Representative(s) Nakashima, Sayama, Amato, Hashem, Onishi, Tam; Ayes with reservations: none; 1 Noes: Representative(s) Pierick; and 4 Excused: Representative(s) Belatti, Hussey-Burdick, Gates, Lowen.
|
|
|
House
|
04/11/2023
|
Resolution scheduled to be heard by CPC/LMG on Thursday, 04-13-23 2:00PM in conference room 329 VIA VIDEOCONFERENCE.
|
|
|
House
|
04/11/2023
|
Referred to CPC/LMG, FIN, referral sheet 28
|
|
|
House
|
04/05/2023
|
Received from Senate (Sen. Com. No. 564) in amended form (SD 1).
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/05/2023
|
Report and Resolution Adopted, as amended (SD 1). Transmitted to House.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/05/2023
|
Waived referral to WAM.
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/28/2023
|
Report adopted, as amended (SD 1) and referred to WAM.
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/28/2023
|
Reported from CPN (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 1431), as amended (SD 1), with recommendation of referral to WAM.
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/16/2023
|
The committee(s) on CPN recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in CPN were as follows: 4 Aye(s): Senator(s) Keohokalole, Fukunaga, McKelvey, Richards; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 1 No(es): Senator(s) Awa; and 0 Excused: none.
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/10/2023
|
The committee(s) on CPN has scheduled a public hearing on 03-16-23 10:00AM; Conference Room 229 & Videoconference.
|
|
|
Senate
|
01/30/2023
|
Referred to CPN, WAM.
|
|
|
Senate
|
01/25/2023
|
Offered.
|
|
|