Senate
|
05/22/2023
|
Certified copies of resolutions sent.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/25/2023
|
Resolution adopted in final form.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/25/2023
|
Received from House (Hse. Com. No. 857).
|
|
|
House
|
04/24/2023
|
Transmitted to Senate.
|
|
|
House
|
04/24/2023
|
Adopted with none voting aye with reservations; Representative(s) Alcos, Garcia, Pierick, Ward voting no (4) and none excused (0).
|
|
|
House
|
04/24/2023
|
Reported from FIN (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 2253), recommending adoption.
|
|
|
House
|
04/19/2023
|
The committee on FIN recommend that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes were as follows: 12 Ayes: Representative(s) Yamashita, Kitagawa, Aiu, Chun, Cochran, Garrett, Kahaloa, Lamosao, Morikawa, Poepoe, Takenouchi, Alcos; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and 4 Excused: Representative(s) Kila, Kobayashi, Nishimoto, Ward.
|
|
|
House
|
04/17/2023
|
Scheduled for decision making on Wednesday, 04-19-23 2:00PM in conference room 308 VIA VIDEOCONFERENCE.
|
|
|
House
|
04/17/2023
|
Report adopted; referred to the committee(s) on FIN with none voting aye with reservations; Representative(s) Pierick voting no (1) and Representative(s) Lowen, Nakashima excused (2).
|
|
|
House
|
04/17/2023
|
Reported from CPC (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 2159), recommending referral to FIN.
|
|
|
House
|
04/13/2023
|
The committee on CPC recommend that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes were as follows: 6 Ayes: Representative(s) Nakashima, Sayama, Amato, Hashem, Onishi, Tam; Ayes with reservations: none; 1 Noes: Representative(s) Pierick; and 4 Excused: Representative(s) Belatti, Hussey-Burdick, Gates, Lowen.
|
|
|
House
|
04/11/2023
|
Resolution scheduled to be heard by CPC on Thursday, 04-13-23 2:15PM in conference room 329 VIA VIDEOCONFERENCE.
|
|
|
House
|
04/11/2023
|
Referred to CPC, FIN, referral sheet 28
|
|
|
House
|
04/05/2023
|
Received from Senate (Sen. Com. No. 634) in amended form (SD 1).
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/05/2023
|
Report and Resolution Adopted as amended (SD 1). Aye(s) with reservations: Senator(s) Fevella. Noes, 1 (Senator(s) Awa). Transmitted to House.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/04/2023
|
One Day Notice 04-05-23.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/04/2023
|
Reported from HHS (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 1568) with recommendation of adoption, as amended (SD 1).
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/24/2023
|
The committee(s) on HHS recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in HHS were as follows: 3 Aye(s): Senator(s) Aquino, Moriwaki, Shimabukuro; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 1 No(es): Senator(s) Awa; and 1 Excused: Senator(s) San Buenaventura.
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/21/2023
|
The committee(s) on HHS has scheduled a public hearing on 03-24-23 1:02PM; Conference Room 225 & Videoconference.
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/15/2023
|
Referred to HHS.
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/10/2023
|
Offered.
|
|
|