Senate | 03/31/2023 | Recommitted to AEN/HHS. | ||
Senate | 03/30/2023 | One Day Notice 03-31-23. | ||
Senate | 03/30/2023 | Reported from AEN/HHS (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 1438) with recommendation of adoption. | ||
Senate | 03/20/2023 | The committee(s) on AEN recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes in AEN were as follows: 5 Aye(s): Senator(s) Gabbard, Richards, DeCoite, Rhoads, Awa; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 0 Excused: none. | ||
Senate | 03/20/2023 | The committee(s) on HHS recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes in HHS were as follows: 4 Aye(s): Senator(s) San Buenaventura, Aquino, Shimabukuro, Awa; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 1 Excused: Senator(s) Moriwaki. | ||
Senate | 03/16/2023 | The committee(s) on AEN/HHS has scheduled a public hearing on 03-20-23 1:30PM; Conference Room 224 & Videoconference. | ||
Senate | 01/30/2023 | Referred to AEN/HHS. | ||
Senate | 01/25/2023 | Offered. |