Senate
|
05/22/2023
|
Certified copies of resolutions sent.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/25/2023
|
Resolution adopted in final form.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/25/2023
|
Received from House (Hse. Com. No. 850).
|
|
|
House
|
04/24/2023
|
Transmitted to Senate.
|
|
|
House
|
04/24/2023
|
Adopted with Representative(s) Garcia voting aye with reservations; Representative(s) Pierick voting no (1) and none excused (0).
|
|
|
House
|
04/24/2023
|
Reported from FIN (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 2249), recommending adoption.
|
|
|
House
|
04/19/2023
|
The committee on FIN recommend that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes were as follows: 12 Ayes: Representative(s) Yamashita, Kitagawa, Aiu, Chun, Cochran, Garrett, Kahaloa, Lamosao, Morikawa, Poepoe, Takenouchi, Alcos; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and 4 Excused: Representative(s) Kila, Kobayashi, Nishimoto, Ward.
|
|
|
House
|
04/17/2023
|
Scheduled for decision making on Wednesday, 04-19-23 2:00PM in conference room 308 VIA VIDEOCONFERENCE.
|
|
|
House
|
04/17/2023
|
Report adopted; referred to the committee(s) on FIN with Representative(s) Garcia voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Lowen, Nakashima excused (2).
|
|
|
House
|
04/17/2023
|
Reported from EDN (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 2207), recommending referral to FIN.
|
|
|
House
|
04/13/2023
|
The committee on EDN recommend that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes were as follows: 8 Ayes: Representative(s) Woodson, Marten, Evslin, Kapela, La Chica, Martinez, Perruso; Ayes with reservations: Representative(s) Garcia; Noes: none; and 3 Excused: Representative(s) Matayoshi, Quinlan, Todd.
|
|
|
House
|
04/11/2023
|
Resolution scheduled to be heard by EDN on Thursday, 04-13-23 2:00PM in conference room 309 VIA VIDEOCONFERENCE.
|
|
|
House
|
04/11/2023
|
Referred to EDN, FIN, referral sheet 28
|
|
|
House
|
04/05/2023
|
Received from Senate (Sen. Com. No. 581).
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/05/2023
|
Report and Resolution Adopted. Transmitted to House.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/04/2023
|
One Day Notice 04-05-23.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/04/2023
|
Reported from EDU (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 1672) with recommendation of adoption.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/03/2023
|
The committee(s) on EDU recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes in EDU were as follows: 5 Aye(s): Senator(s) Kidani, Kim, Kanuha, Richards, Fevella; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 0 Excused: none.
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/31/2023
|
The committee(s) on EDU has scheduled a public hearing on 04-03-23 3:30PM; Conference Room 229 & Videoconference.
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/10/2023
|
Referred to EDU.
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/09/2023
|
Offered.
|
|
|