Senate
|
05/22/2023
|
Certified copies of resolutions sent.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/18/2023
|
Resolution adopted in final form.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/18/2023
|
Received from House (Hse. Com. No. 812).
|
|
|
House
|
04/17/2023
|
Transmitted to Senate.
|
|
|
House
|
04/17/2023
|
Adopted with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Lowen, Nakashima excused (2).
|
|
|
House
|
04/17/2023
|
Reported from WAL/EEP (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 2232), recommending adoption.
|
|
|
House
|
04/13/2023
|
The committee on EEP recommend that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes were as follows: 4 Ayes: Representative(s) Lowen, Cochran, Kahaloa, Perruso; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and 3 Excused: Representative(s) Gates, Woodson, Ward.
|
|
|
House
|
04/13/2023
|
The committee on WAL recommend that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes were as follows: 6 Ayes: Representative(s) Ichiyama, Poepoe, Chun, Morikawa, Takayama, Souza; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and 2 Excused: Representative(s) Ganaden, Hashem.
|
|
|
House
|
04/11/2023
|
Resolution scheduled to be heard by WAL/EEP on Thursday, 04-13-23 8:45AM in conference room 325 VIA VIDEOCONFERENCE.
|
|
|
House
|
04/11/2023
|
Referred to WAL/EEP, referral sheet 28
|
|
|
House
|
04/05/2023
|
Received from Senate (Sen. Com. No. 582) in amended form (SD 1).
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/05/2023
|
Report and Resolution Adopted, as amended (SD 1). Transmitted to House.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/04/2023
|
One Day Notice 04-05-23.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/04/2023
|
Reported from AEN (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 1679) with recommendation of adoption, as amended (SD 1).
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/29/2023
|
The committee(s) on AEN recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in AEN were as follows: 5 Aye(s): Senator(s) Gabbard, Richards, DeCoite, Rhoads, Awa; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 0 Excused: none.
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/22/2023
|
The committee(s) on AEN has scheduled a public hearing on 03-29-23 1:01PM; Conference Room 224 & Videoconference.
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/15/2023
|
Re-Referred to AEN.
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/10/2023
|
Referred to WAM/AEN.
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/09/2023
|
Offered.
|
|
|