Senate
|
05/22/2023
|
Certified copies of resolutions sent.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/18/2023
|
Resolution adopted in final form.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/18/2023
|
Received from House (Hse. Com. No. 813).
|
|
|
House
|
04/17/2023
|
Transmitted to Senate.
|
|
|
House
|
04/17/2023
|
Adopted with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Lowen, Nakashima excused (2).
|
|
|
House
|
04/17/2023
|
Reported from HET (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 2211), recommending adoption.
|
|
|
House
|
04/13/2023
|
The committee on HET recommend that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes were as follows: 9 Ayes: Representative(s) Perruso, Kapela, Evslin, La Chica, Marten, Martinez, Matayoshi, Woodson, Garcia; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and 2 Excused: Representative(s) Quinlan, Todd.
|
|
|
House
|
04/12/2023
|
Scheduled for decision making on Thursday, 04-13-23 2:05PM in conference room 309 VIA VIDEOCONFERENCE.
|
|
|
House
|
04/12/2023
|
The committee(s) on HET recommend(s) that the measure be deferred until 04-13-23.
|
|
|
House
|
04/11/2023
|
Resolution scheduled to be heard by HET on Wednesday, 04-12-23 2:00PM in conference room 309 VIA VIDEOCONFERENCE.
|
|
|
House
|
04/11/2023
|
Referred to HET, referral sheet 28
|
|
|
House
|
04/05/2023
|
Received from Senate (Sen. Com. No. 586).
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/05/2023
|
Report and Resolution Adopted. Transmitted to House.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/04/2023
|
One Day Notice 04-05-23.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/04/2023
|
Reported from EET (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 1560) with recommendation of adoption.
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/28/2023
|
The committee(s) on EET recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes in EET were as follows: 5 Aye(s): Senator(s) DeCoite, Wakai, Fukunaga, Kim, Fevella; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 0 Excused: none.
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/22/2023
|
The committee(s) on EET has scheduled a public hearing on 03-28-23 1:05PM; Conference Room 229 & Videoconference.
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/15/2023
|
Referred to EET.
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/10/2023
|
Offered.
|
|
|