House
|
04/17/2023
|
Report adopted. referred to the committee(s) on FIN as amended in HD 1 with none voting aye with reservations; Representative(s) Garcia voting no (1) and Representative(s) Lowen, Nakashima excused (2).
|
|
|
House
|
04/17/2023
|
Reported from LGO (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 2189) as amended in HD 1, recommending referral to FIN.
|
|
|
House
|
04/13/2023
|
The committee on LGO recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 4 Ayes: Representative(s) Garrett, Kapela, Martinez, Tam; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and 3 Excused: Representative(s) Matayoshi, Sayama, Alcos.
|
|
|
House
|
04/11/2023
|
Resolution scheduled to be heard by LGO on Thursday, 04-13-23 9:30AM in conference room 309 VIA VIDEOCONFERENCE.
|
|
|
House
|
04/11/2023
|
Referred to LGO, FIN, referral sheet 28
|
|
|
House
|
04/05/2023
|
Received from Senate (Sen. Com. No. 594).
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/05/2023
|
Report and Resolution Adopted. Aye(s) with reservations: none. Noes, 1 (Senator(s) Awa). Transmitted to House.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/04/2023
|
One Day Notice 04-05-23.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/04/2023
|
Reported from GVO/HHS (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 1629) with recommendation of adoption.
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/31/2023
|
The committee(s) on HHS recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes in HHS were as follows: 4 Aye(s): Senator(s) San Buenaventura, Aquino, Moriwaki, Shimabukuro; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 1 No(es): Senator(s) Awa; and 0 Excused: none.
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/31/2023
|
The committee(s) on GVO recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes in GVO were as follows: 3 Aye(s): Senator(s) McKelvey, Gabbard, San Buenaventura; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 1 No(es): Senator(s) Awa; and 1 Excused: Senator(s) Wakai.
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/28/2023
|
The committee(s) on GVO/HHS has scheduled a public hearing on 03-31-23 1:00PM; Conference Room 225 & Videoconference.
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/15/2023
|
Referred to GVO/HHS.
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/10/2023
|
Offered.
|
|
|