House
|
04/17/2023
|
Report adopted; referred to the committee(s) on FIN with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Lowen, Nakashima excused (2).
|
|
|
House
|
04/17/2023
|
Reported from HUS (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 2184), recommending referral to FIN.
|
|
|
House
|
04/13/2023
|
The committee on HUS recommend that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes were as follows: 6 Ayes: Representative(s) Mizuno, Amato, Belatti, Ilagan, Kobayashi, Takenouchi; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and 2 Excused: Representative(s) Nishimoto, Garcia.
|
|
|
House
|
04/11/2023
|
Resolution scheduled to be heard by HUS on Thursday, 04-13-23 9:15AM in conference room 329 VIA VIDEOCONFERENCE.
|
|
|
House
|
04/11/2023
|
Referred to HUS, FIN, referral sheet 28
|
|
|
House
|
03/31/2023
|
Received from Senate (Sen. Com. No. 534).
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/31/2023
|
Report and Resolution Adopted. Transmitted to House.
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/30/2023
|
One Day Notice 03-31-23.
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/30/2023
|
Reported from HHS (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 1472) with recommendation of adoption.
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/24/2023
|
The committee(s) on HHS recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes in HHS were as follows: 4 Aye(s): Senator(s) Aquino, Moriwaki, Shimabukuro, Awa; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 1 Excused: Senator(s) San Buenaventura.
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/21/2023
|
The committee(s) on HHS has scheduled a public hearing on 03-24-23 1:02PM; Conference Room 225 & Videoconference.
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/15/2023
|
Referred to HHS.
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/10/2023
|
Offered.
|
|
|