House | 04/11/2023 | Referred to CMV, JHA, referral sheet 28 | ||
House | 04/05/2023 | Received from Senate (Sen. Com. No. 596) in amended form (SD 1). | ||
Senate | 04/05/2023 | Report and Resolution Adopted, as amended (SD 1). Transmitted to House. | ||
Senate | 04/04/2023 | One Day Notice 04-05-23. | ||
Senate | 04/04/2023 | Reported from PSM (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 1666) with recommendation of adoption, as amended (SD 1). | ||
Senate | 03/31/2023 | The committee(s) on PSM recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in PSM were as follows: 5 Aye(s): Senator(s) Wakai, Elefante, Fukunaga, McKelvey, Awa; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 0 Excused: none. | ||
Senate | 03/24/2023 | The committee(s) on PSM has scheduled a public hearing on 03-31-23 3:01PM; Conference Room 225 & Videoconference. | ||
Senate | 03/15/2023 | Referred to PSM. | ||
Senate | 03/10/2023 | Offered. |