House
|
04/17/2023
|
Report adopted; referred to the committee(s) on FIN with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Lowen, Nakashima excused (2).
|
|
|
House
|
04/17/2023
|
Reported from TRN (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 2171), recommending referral to FIN.
|
|
|
House
|
04/13/2023
|
The committee on TRN recommend that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes were as follows: 8 Ayes: Representative(s) Kila, Aiu, Evslin, Hashimoto, Kitagawa, Marten, Onishi, Matsumoto; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and 1 Excused: Representative(s) Todd.
|
|
|
House
|
04/11/2023
|
Resolution scheduled to be heard by TRN on Thursday, 04-13-23 10:00AM in conference room 312 VIA VIDEOCONFERENCE.
|
|
|
House
|
04/11/2023
|
Referred to TRN, FIN, referral sheet 28
|
|
|
House
|
04/05/2023
|
Received from Senate (Sen. Com. No. 600) in amended form (SD 1).
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/05/2023
|
Report and Resolution Adopted, as amended (SD 1). Transmitted to House.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/04/2023
|
One Day Notice 04-05-23.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/04/2023
|
Reported from TCA/GVO (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 1526) with recommendation of adoption, as amended (SD 1).
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/28/2023
|
The committee(s) on GVO recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in GVO were as follows: 5 Aye(s): Senator(s) McKelvey, Gabbard, San Buenaventura, Wakai, Awa; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 0 Excused: none.
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/28/2023
|
The committee(s) on TCA recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in TCA were as follows: 5 Aye(s): Senator(s) Lee, Inouye, Elefante, Keohokalole, Awa; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 0 Excused: none.
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/24/2023
|
The committee(s) on TCA/GVO has scheduled a public hearing on 03-28-23 3:45PM; Conference Room 224 & Videoconference.
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/15/2023
|
Referred to TCA/GVO.
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/10/2023
|
Offered.
|
|
|