Senate | 05/22/2023 | Certified copies of resolutions sent. | ||
Senate | 03/31/2023 | Report and Resolution Adopted. Aye(s) with reservations: none. Noes, 1 (Senator(s) Awa). | ||
Senate | 03/30/2023 | One Day Notice 03-31-23. | ||
Senate | 03/30/2023 | Reported from LBT (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 1475) with recommendation of adoption. | ||
Senate | 03/22/2023 | The committee(s) on LBT recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes in LBT were as follows: 4 Aye(s): Senator(s) Moriwaki, Lee, Ihara, Keith-Agaran; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 1 Excused: Senator(s) Fevella. | ||
Senate | 03/17/2023 | The committee(s) on LBT has scheduled a public hearing on 03-22-23 3:00PM; Conference Room 224 & Videoconference. | ||
Senate | 03/15/2023 | Referred to LBT. | ||
Senate | 03/10/2023 | Offered. |