Senate | 05/22/2023 | Certified copies of resolutions sent. | ||
Senate | 04/05/2023 | Report and Resolution Adopted. | ||
Senate | 04/04/2023 | One Day Notice 04-05-23. | ||
Senate | 04/04/2023 | Reported from EDU (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 1676) with recommendation of adoption. | ||
Senate | 04/03/2023 | The committee(s) on EDU recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes in EDU were as follows: 5 Aye(s): Senator(s) Kidani, Kim, Kanuha, Richards, Fevella; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 0 Excused: none. | ||
Senate | 03/31/2023 | The committee(s) on EDU has scheduled a public hearing on 04-03-23 3:30PM; Conference Room 229 & Videoconference. | ||
Senate | 03/15/2023 | Referred to EDU. | ||
Senate | 03/10/2023 | Offered. |