Senate | 05/22/2023 | Certified copies of resolutions sent. | ||
Senate | 04/05/2023 | Report and Resolution Adopted as amended (SD 1). Aye(s) with reservations: Senator(s) Fevella. Noes, 1 (Senator(s) Awa). | ||
Senate | 04/04/2023 | One Day Notice 04-05-23. | ||
Senate | 04/04/2023 | Reported from HHS (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 1569) with recommendation of adoption, as amended (SD 1). | ||
Senate | 03/24/2023 | The committee(s) on HHS recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in HHS were as follows: 3 Aye(s): Senator(s) Aquino, Moriwaki, Shimabukuro; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 1 No(es): Senator(s) Awa; and 1 Excused: Senator(s) San Buenaventura. | ||
Senate | 03/21/2023 | The committee(s) on HHS has scheduled a public hearing on 03-24-23 1:02PM; Conference Room 225 & Videoconference. | ||
Senate | 03/15/2023 | Referred to HHS. | ||
Senate | 03/10/2023 | Offered. |