Senate | 05/22/2023 | Certified copies of resolutions sent. | ||
Senate | 04/05/2023 | Report and Resolution Adopted, as amended (SD 1). | ||
Senate | 04/04/2023 | One Day Notice 04-05-23. | ||
Senate | 04/04/2023 | Reported from WTL/HOU (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 1704) with recommendation of adoption, as amended (SD 1). | ||
Senate | 04/04/2023 | The committee(s) on WTL recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in WTL were as follows: 5 Aye(s): Senator(s) Inouye, Elefante, Chang, McKelvey, Fevella; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 0 Excused: none. | ||
Senate | 04/04/2023 | The committee(s) on HOU recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in HOU were as follows: 4 Aye(s): Senator(s) Chang, Kanuha, Rhoads, Awa; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 1 Excused: Senator(s) Aquino. | ||
Senate | 03/24/2023 | The committee(s) on WTL/HOU has scheduled a public hearing on 04-04-23 1:00PM; Conference Room 225 & Videoconference. | ||
Senate | 03/15/2023 | Referred to WTL/HOU. | ||
Senate | 03/10/2023 | Offered. |