Senate | 05/22/2023 | Certified copies of resolutions sent. | ||
Senate | 04/05/2023 | Report and Resolution Adopted. | ||
Senate | 04/04/2023 | One Day Notice 04-05-23. | ||
Senate | 04/04/2023 | Reported from AEN (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 1653) with recommendation of adoption. | ||
Senate | 03/22/2023 | The committee(s) on AEN recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes in AEN were as follows: 5 Aye(s): Senator(s) Gabbard, Richards, DeCoite, Rhoads, Awa; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 0 Excused: none. | ||
Senate | 03/17/2023 | The committee(s) on AEN has scheduled a public hearing on 03-22-23 1:30PM; Conference Room 224 & Videoconference. | ||
Senate | 03/15/2023 | Referred to AEN. | ||
Senate | 03/10/2023 | Offered. |