Senate | 05/22/2023 | Certified copies of resolutions sent. | ||
Senate | 04/05/2023 | Report and Resolution Adopted, as amended (SD 1). | ||
Senate | 04/04/2023 | One Day Notice 04-05-23. | ||
Senate | 04/04/2023 | Reported from HHS (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 1573) with recommendation of adoption, as amended (SD 1). | ||
Senate | 03/20/2023 | The committee(s) on HHS recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in HHS were as follows: 5 Aye(s): Senator(s) San Buenaventura, Aquino, Moriwaki, Shimabukuro, Awa; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 0 Excused: none. | ||
Senate | 03/16/2023 | The committee(s) on HHS has scheduled a public hearing on 03-20-23 1:00PM; Conference Room 225 & Videoconference. | ||
Senate | 03/09/2023 | Referred to HHS. | ||
Senate | 03/03/2023 | Offered. |