Hawaii 2023 Regular Session

Hawaii Senate Bill SR54 Compare Versions

Only one version of the bill is available at this time.
OldNewDifferences
11 THE SENATE S.R. NO. 54 THIRTY-SECOND LEGISLATURE, 2023 STATE OF HAWAII SENATE RESOLUTION RECOGNIZING OCTOBER 2 THROUGH OCTOBER 6, 2023, AND OCTOBER 7 THROUGH OCTOBER 11, 2024, AS DIGITAL INCLUSION WEEK IN THE STATE OF HAWAII.
22
33 THE SENATE S.R. NO. 54
44 THIRTY-SECOND LEGISLATURE, 2023
55 STATE OF HAWAII
66
77 THE SENATE
88
99 S.R. NO.
1010
1111 54
1212
1313 THIRTY-SECOND LEGISLATURE, 2023
1414
1515
1616
1717 STATE OF HAWAII
1818
1919
2020
2121
2222
2323
2424
2525
2626
2727
2828
2929 SENATE RESOLUTION
3030
3131
3232
3333
3434
3535 RECOGNIZING OCTOBER 2 THROUGH OCTOBER 6, 2023, AND OCTOBER 7 THROUGH OCTOBER 11, 2024, AS DIGITAL INCLUSION WEEK IN THE STATE OF HAWAII.
3636
3737
3838
3939
4040
4141 WHEREAS, broadband services are essential infrastructure for the twenty-first century and play an important role in providing access to knowledge and opportunities from around the world; and WHEREAS, digital equity ensures that all individuals and communities have the information technology capacity needed for full participation in our society, democracy, and economy and is necessary for civic and cultural participation, lifelong learning, and access to essential services, such as telemedicine, distance learning, and the workplace; and WHEREAS, the coronavirus disease 2019 pandemic heightened the demand for reliable, affordable internet connectivity as work, education, and access to essential services have shifted toward being provided online; and WHEREAS, broadband access, where available, has helped to deliver public health information to vulnerable Hawaii residents who experience socioeconomic disparities and those who live in underserved and unserved communities; and WHEREAS, many rural, agricultural, and lower-income communities throughout the State lack access to reliable and affordable broadband due to the lack of infrastructure; discrimination in investment in delivering technology and technology-related services to specific areas or populations; or barriers derived from socioeconomic status, education, literacy, language, or disabilities; and WHEREAS, the State is committed to promoting digital inclusion to ensure that all individuals and communities, including the most remote and disadvantaged, have access to information and communication technologies, including affordable, robust broadband internet service; internet-enabled devices that meet the needs of the user; access to digital literacy training; quality technical support; and applications and online content designed to enable and encourage self-sufficiency, participation, and collaboration; and WHEREAS, to raise awareness of the need for digital equity and to promote digital inclusion, Senate Concurrent Resolution No. 25, S.D. 1, Regular Session of 2022, further recognized October 3 through October 7, 2022, as Digital Inclusion Week in the State; and WHEREAS, Digital Inclusion Week is spearheaded by the National Digital Inclusion Alliance, which represents affiliated organizations working toward digital equity by crafting, identifying, and disseminating financial and operational resources for digital inclusion programs to raise awareness of solutions addressing home internet access, personal devices, and local technology training and support programs; now, therefore, BE IT RESOLVED by the Senate of the Thirty-second Legislature of the State of Hawaii, Regular Session of 2023, that October 2 through October 6, 2023, and October 7 through October 11, 2024, are recognized as Digital Inclusion Week in the State to raise awareness of the need for digital equity and to promote digital inclusion; and BE IT FURTHER RESOLVED that certified copies of this Resolution be transmitted to the Governor; Director of Business, Economic Development, and Tourism; Strategic Broadband Coordinator of the Hawaii Broadband and Digital Equity Office; Mayor of the City and County of Honolulu; Mayor of the County of Maui; Mayor of the County of Kauai; and Mayor of the County of Hawaii. OFFERED BY: _____________________________ Report Title: Digital Inclusion Week; Broadband; Digital Equity; Rural, Agricultural, and Lower-Income Communities
4242
4343 WHEREAS, broadband services are essential infrastructure for the twenty-first century and play an important role in providing access to knowledge and opportunities from around the world; and
4444
4545
4646
4747 WHEREAS, digital equity ensures that all individuals and communities have the information technology capacity needed for full participation in our society, democracy, and economy and is necessary for civic and cultural participation, lifelong learning, and access to essential services, such as telemedicine, distance learning, and the workplace; and
4848
4949
5050
5151 WHEREAS, the coronavirus disease 2019 pandemic heightened the demand for reliable, affordable internet connectivity as work, education, and access to essential services have shifted toward being provided online; and
5252
5353
5454
5555 WHEREAS, broadband access, where available, has helped to deliver public health information to vulnerable Hawaii residents who experience socioeconomic disparities and those who live in underserved and unserved communities; and
5656
5757
5858
5959 WHEREAS, many rural, agricultural, and lower-income communities throughout the State lack access to reliable and affordable broadband due to the lack of infrastructure; discrimination in investment in delivering technology and technology-related services to specific areas or populations; or barriers derived from socioeconomic status, education, literacy, language, or disabilities; and
6060
6161
6262
6363 WHEREAS, the State is committed to promoting digital inclusion to ensure that all individuals and communities, including the most remote and disadvantaged, have access to information and communication technologies, including affordable, robust broadband internet service; internet-enabled devices that meet the needs of the user; access to digital literacy training; quality technical support; and applications and online content designed to enable and encourage self-sufficiency, participation, and collaboration; and
6464
6565
6666
6767 WHEREAS, to raise awareness of the need for digital equity and to promote digital inclusion, Senate Concurrent Resolution No. 25, S.D. 1, Regular Session of 2022, further recognized October 3 through October 7, 2022, as Digital Inclusion Week in the State; and
6868
6969
7070
7171 WHEREAS, Digital Inclusion Week is spearheaded by the National Digital Inclusion Alliance, which represents affiliated organizations working toward digital equity by crafting, identifying, and disseminating financial and operational resources for digital inclusion programs to raise awareness of solutions addressing home internet access, personal devices, and local technology training and support programs; now, therefore,
7272
7373
7474
7575 BE IT RESOLVED by the Senate of the Thirty-second Legislature of the State of Hawaii, Regular Session of 2023, that October 2 through October 6, 2023, and October 7 through October 11, 2024, are recognized as Digital Inclusion Week in the State to raise awareness of the need for digital equity and to promote digital inclusion; and
7676
7777
7878
7979 BE IT FURTHER RESOLVED that certified copies of this Resolution be transmitted to the Governor; Director of Business, Economic Development, and Tourism; Strategic Broadband Coordinator of the Hawaii Broadband and Digital Equity Office; Mayor of the City and County of Honolulu; Mayor of the County of Maui; Mayor of the County of Kauai; and Mayor of the County of Hawaii.
8080
8181
8282
8383
8484
8585
8686
8787 OFFERED BY: _____________________________
8888
8989
9090
9191 OFFERED BY:
9292
9393 _____________________________
9494
9595
9696
9797
9898
9999 Report Title:
100100
101101 Digital Inclusion Week; Broadband; Digital Equity; Rural, Agricultural, and Lower-Income Communities