Senate | 05/22/2023 | Certified copies of resolutions sent. | ||
Senate | 03/31/2023 | Report and Resolution Adopted. | ||
Senate | 03/30/2023 | One Day Notice 03-31-23. | ||
Senate | 03/30/2023 | Reported from HWN (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 1477) with recommendation of adoption. | ||
Senate | 03/21/2023 | The committee(s) on HWN recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes in HWN were as follows: 5 Aye(s): Senator(s) Shimabukuro, Fevella, Ihara, Keohokalole, Richards; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 0 Excused: none. | ||
Senate | 03/17/2023 | The committee(s) on HWN has scheduled a public hearing on 03-21-23 1:01PM; Conference Room 224 & Videoconference. | ||
Senate | 03/15/2023 | Referred to HWN. | ||
Senate | 03/10/2023 | Offered. |